Address
c/o Gemeindeverwaltung
Kirchplatz 3
3920 Zermatt
Reports for Fondation Zermatt Summit
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Fondation Zermatt Summit
- Fondation Zermatt Summit with its legal headquarters in Zermatt is active. Fondation Zermatt Summit operates in the sector «Trade fair, exhibition and convention organising».
- The organization was founded on 08.01.2010 and has 5 persons in its management.
- On the 08.08.2019 the commercial register entry of the organization was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The organization is registered in the commercial register VS under the UID CHE-115.335.622.
Management (5)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Antonin Gilles Pujos,
Eric Brian Rosenbaum,
Nicolas Louis Edmond Buttet,
Christopher Hugh Wasserman
newest authorized signatories
Antonin Gilles Pujos,
Eric Brian Rosenbaum,
Nicolas Louis Edmond Buttet,
Christopher Hugh Wasserman
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
08.01.2010
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Zermatt
Commercial Registry Office
VS
Commercial register number
CH-600.7.014.014-8
UID/VAT
CHE-115.335.622
Sector
Trade fair, exhibition and convention organising
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Organisation und Finanzierung von Foren in Zermatt und eventuell an andern Orten sowie alle damit zusammenhängenden Tätigkeiten in der Absicht Lösungen einzubringen, dass die Herausforderungen der Globalisation die Menschenwürde und das Gemeinwohl mit sich zieht in dem der Mensch in den Mittelpunkt gestellt wird mittels eines Finanzsystems für eine Wirtschaft im Dienste des Gemeinwohls und des Gemeinwohls im Dienste des Menschen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Auditor Services SA | Orsières | 03.11.2017 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Alpes Audit SA | Martigny | 14.01.2010 | 02.11.2017 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Zermatt Summit Foundation
- Fondation Zermatt SummitZermatt Summit Foundation
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Fondation Zermatt Summit
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004692542, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (600)
Fondation Zermatt Summit, in Zermatt, CHE-115.335.622, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 120 vom 25.06.2018, Publ. 4312181).
Urkundenänderung:
10.09.2017. 30.11.2017. [Die publikationspflichtigen Tatsachen haben keine Änderung erfahren.]
Publication number: 4312181, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (600)
Fondation Zermatt Summit, in Zermatt, CHE-115.335.622, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 214 vom 03.11.2017, Publ. 3849999).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Fournier, Jean-René Marcel Lucien, von Veysonnaz, in Sion, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Seine kaiserliche und königliche Hoheit der Erzherzog Rudolf von Österreich, österreichischer und belgischer Staatsangehöriger, in Torny-le-Grand (Torny), Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 3849999, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (600)
Fondation Zermatt Summit, in Zermatt, CHE-115.335.622, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 198 vom 12.10.2017, Publ. 3806877).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Alpes Audit SA (CH-621.3.002.899-8), in Martigny, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Auditor Services SA (CHE-188.805.730), in Orsières, Revisionsstelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.