Reports for Fondation pour les classes d'enseignement spécialisé de la Gruyère
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Fondation pour les classes d'enseignement spécialisé de la Gruyère
- Fondation pour les classes d'enseignement spécialisé de la Gruyère has its legal headquarters in Bulle, is active and operates in the sector «Operation of primary schools».
- The organization was founded on 08.09.1984.
- On the 28.06.2024 the commercial register entry of the organization was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The organization is registered in the commercial register FR under the UID CHE-102.830.579.
Management (11)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Eric Jolliet,
Nathalie Carrel,
Olivier Morand,
Vincent Louis Bosson,
Anne Sylvie Favre
newest authorized signatories
Vincent Louis Bosson,
Christelle Moret,
Didier Jonin,
David Christophe Seydoux
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
08.09.1984
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Bulle
Commercial Registry Office
FR
Commercial register number
CH-217.0.470.661-0
UID/VAT
CHE-102.830.579
Sector
Operation of primary schools
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Venir en aide aux enfants en difficultés scolaires au moyen de la pédagogie spécialisée. Cette aide est destinée en priorité aux enfants de la Gruyère. La fondation peut en outre accomplir toutes tâches en relation directe ou indirecte avec son but social. La fondation ne poursuit aucun but lucratif ni commercial.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fiduconsult Bulle SA | Bulle | 14.01.2020 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
FIDUSERVICE S.A. | Bulle | 10.01.2014 | 13.01.2020 | |
Fiduciaire Ruffieux S.A. | Bulle | 09.03.2007 | 09.01.2014 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Fondation pour les classes d'enseignement spécialisés de la Gruyère
- Fondation La Ruche
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Fondation pour les classes d'enseignement spécialisé de la Gruyère
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006070064, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
Fondation pour les classes d'enseignement spécialisé de la Gruyère, à Bulle, CHE-102.830.579 (FOSC du 29.05.2024, p. 0/1006042548).
Personnes radiée:
Eguizabal Adrienne, membre du conseil de fondation, sans signature;
Sauterel-Doutaz Christine Charlotte, membre du conseil de fondation, sans signature.
Nouvelles personnes inscrites:
Carrel Nathalie, de et à Pont-la-Ville, membre du conseil de fondation, sans signature;
Jolliet Eric, de Haut-Intyamon, à Bulle, membre du conseil de fondation, sans signature.
Publication number: HR02-1006042548, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
Fondation pour les classes d'enseignement spécialisé de la Gruyère, à Bulle, CHE-102.830.579 (FOSC du 13.03.2023, p. 0/1005698732). Statuts modifiés selon décision de l'Autorité de surveillance du 16.05.2024.
Publication number: HR02-1005698732, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
Fondation pour les classes d'enseignement spécialisé de la Gruyère, à Bulle, CHE-102.830.579 (FOSC du 23.11.2022, p. 0/1005610965).
Adresse précise:
Rue Albert-Rieter 8, 1630 Bulle.
Personne radiée:
Schaller Marie-Paule, membre du conseil de fondation, sans signature.
Nouvelle personne inscrite:
Morand Olivier, de Le Pâquier FR, à Corbières, membre du conseil de fondation, sans signature.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.