Address
c/o Philippe et Anne-Sophie Lerch
Chemin du Bois-Rouge 39
1095 Lutry
Reports for FONDATION LE CEP
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout FONDATION LE CEP
- FONDATION LE CEP with its legal headquarters in Lutry is a Foundation from the sector «Religious, political or secular associations». FONDATION LE CEP is active.
- The management of the organization FONDATION LE CEP, which was founded on the 19.03.1977, consists of 7 persons.
- The organization has last changed their commercial register entry on 21.11.2023, under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The organization is registered in the commercial register VD under the UID CHE-108.142.319.
Management (7)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Laurence Pasquier,
Nicole Spahn,
Nancy Demaurex,
Philippe Lerch,
Anne-Sophie Lerch
newest authorized signatories
Laurence Pasquier,
Nicole Spahn,
Nancy Demaurex,
Philippe Lerch,
Anne-Sophie Lerch
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
19.03.1977
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Lutry
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.0.152.801-8
UID/VAT
CHE-108.142.319
Sector
Religious, political or secular associations
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
La fondation a pour but le partage de la foi chrétienne, l'encouragement et l'enseignement des croyants en particulier par: la Bible, des livres, des conférences publiques, différents médias et d'autres moyens; l'acquisition de locaux destinés notamment à des librairies chrétiennes; la mise à disposition de locaux à des chrétiens; des dons à des organisations poursuivant le même but et/ou un but humanitaire ou social (pour but complet cf. acte de fondation).
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
GRF Société Fiduciaire S.A. | Morges | 02.12.2016 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
BDO SA | Epalinges | 30.08.2006 | 01.12.2016 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Fondation Le Cep
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: FONDATION LE CEP
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005890350, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
FONDATION LE CEP, à Lutry, CHE-108.142.319 (FOSC du 15.10.2020, p. 0/1005001003). Demaurex Monique et Demaurex Claude ne sont plus membres du conseil de fondation;
leur signature est radiée.
Publication number: HR02-1005001003, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
FONDATION LE CEP, à Lutry, CHE-108.142.319 (FOSC du 27.05.2020, p. 0/1004897909). Acte de fondation modifié le 27 août 2020.
Nouveau but:
la fondation a pour but le partage de la foi chrétienne, l'encouragement et l'enseignement des croyants en particulier par: la Bible, des livres, des conférences publiques, différents médias et d'autres moyens;
l'acquisition de locaux destinés notamment à des librairies chrétiennes;
la mise à disposition de locaux à des chrétiens;
des dons à des organisations poursuivant le même but et/ou un but humanitaire ou social (pour but complet cf. acte de fondation).
Publication number: HR02-1004897909, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
FONDATION LE CEP, à Lutry, CHE-108.142.319 (FOSC du 02.12.2016, p. 0/3198917).
Nouvelle adresse:
Chemin du Bois-Rouge 39, c/o Philippe et Anne-Sophie Lerch, 1095 Lutry. Spahn Nicole est nommée présidente et Pasquier Laurence, vice-présidente;
toutes deux signent désormais collectivement à deux. Demaurex Monique, qui n'est plus vice-présidente, reste secrétaire;
Demaurex Claude, n'est plus président;
tous deux signent désormais collectivement à deux, toutefois pas entre eux. Demaurex Jacques-Antoine signe désormais collectivement à deux, toutefois pas avec Nancy Demaurex.
Nouveaux membres du conseil de fondation:
Demaurex Nancy, avec signature collective à deux, toutefois pas avec Jacques-Antoine Demaurex, Lerch Anne-Sophie, les deux de Gilly, et Lerch Philippe, de Sumiswald, avec signature collective à deux, toutefois pas entre eux, les trois à Lutry.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.