Address
c/o Quadis Treuhand AG
Pletschenstrasse 20
3952 Susten
Reports for Fondation la Passiflore
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Fondation la Passiflore
- Fondation la Passiflore has its legal headquarters in Susten and is active. It operates in the sector «Religious, political or secular associations».
- The management of the organization Fondation la Passiflore consists of 5 persons. The foundation of the organization took place on 23.10.1990.
- The organization has last changed their commercial register entry on 02.09.2022, under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The organization Fondation la Passiflore is registered under the UID CHE-102.562.746.
- The address is identical with 28 other active companies. These include: Aitonomi AI Sàrl, Alpenwild GmbH, Ascent Investment GmbH.
Management (5)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Steve Stoppa,
François Théodule Gillioz,
Meinrad Arnold,
Nathalie Georgette Vianin
newest authorized signatories
Steve Stoppa,
François Théodule Gillioz,
Meinrad Arnold,
Nathalie Georgette Vianin
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
23.10.1990
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Leuk
Commercial Registry Office
VS
Commercial register number
CH-660.0.947.990-4
UID/VAT
CHE-102.562.746
Sector
Religious, political or secular associations
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Hilfe an Kinder, Jugendliche und Betagte insbesondere an geistig und körperlich Behinderte und Waisen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fiduciaire Marlyse Liniger | Borex | 18.08.2010 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fiduciaire Monteventi & Cie SA | Genève | 23.05.2007 | 17.08.2010 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Fondation la Passiflore
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005553763, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (600)
Fondation la Passiflore, in Leuk, CHE-102.562.746, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 216 vom 05.11.2020, Publ. 1005016265).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Stoppa, Steve, von Chiasso, in Veyrier, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005016265, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (600)
Fondation la Passiflore, in Leuk, CHE-102.562.746, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 159 vom 18.08.2010, S.17, Publ. 5776018).
Domizil neu:
c/o Quadis Treuhand AG, Pletschenstrasse 20, 3952 Susten.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Vianin, Nathalie Georgette, von Anniviers, in Carouge GE, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Vianin, Nathalie, von Saint-Jean].
Publication number: 5776018, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (600)
Fondation la Passiflore, in Leuk, CH-660.0.947.990-4, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 31 vom 16.02.2009, S. 25, Publ. 4881480).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Fiduciaire Monteventi & Cie SA, in Genève, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Fiduciaire Marlyse Liniger (CH-550.1.047.184-6), in Borex, Revisionsstelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.