Address
c/o Collège des Creusets
Rue de Saint-Guérin 34
1950 Sion
Reports for Fondation Fellini pour le cinéma
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Fondation Fellini pour le cinéma
- Fondation Fellini pour le cinéma has its legal headquarters in Sion, is active and operates in the sector «Operation of libraries and museums».
- The management has 11 active persons registered.
- The commercial register entry of the organization was last modified on 28.08.2024. Under «Notifications» it is possible to view all previous changes.
- The reported UID is CHE-109.490.065.
Management (11)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Dr. Josef Joram Deutsch,
Xavier Gaillard,
Julie Dayer,
Federico Grandesso,
Nicolas Brun
newest authorized signatories
Dr. Josef Joram Deutsch,
Xavier Gaillard,
Julie Dayer,
Federico Grandesso,
Nicolas Brun
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
10.09.2001
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Sion
Commercial Registry Office
VS
Commercial register number
CH-626.7.006.231-0
UID/VAT
CHE-109.490.065
Sector
Operation of libraries and museums
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Conserver et enrichir le fonds décrit à l'art. 3 des présents statuts; favoriser, à travers lui, la recherche en matière cinématographique; le mettre à disposition des enseignants et des étudiants dans un but didactique et pédagogique (par exemple travaux de maturité); organiser des manifestations (expositions, projections, conférences, séminaires, festivals), promouvoir l'information (notamment par des publications et par un site internet) dans le but de mettre en valeur la collection et la faire connaître au public; collaborer en tant que partenaire à toute manifestation culturelle.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
BDO SA | Sion | 16.03.2015 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Fondation Fellini pour le cinéma
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006116607, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
Fondation Fellini pour le cinéma, à Sion, CHE-109.490.065, fondation (No. FOSC 34 du 19.02.2024, Publ. 1005965064).
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Deutsch, Josef Joram, dit Joram, de Belmont-sur-Lausanne, à Pully, membre du conseil de fondation, avec signature collective à deux avec le président.
Publication number: HR02-1005965064, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
Fondation Fellini pour le cinéma, à Sion, CHE-109.490.065, fondation (No. FOSC 97 du 22.05.2023, Publ. 1005751131).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Rouiller, Nicolas, de Dorénaz, à Bourg-en-Lavaux, directeur, avec signature collective à deux avec le président.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Gaillard, Xavier, de Ardon, à Fully, membre du conseil de fondation, avec signature collective à deux avec le président.
Publication number: HR02-1005751131, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
Fondation Fellini pour le cinéma, à Sion, CHE-109.490.065, fondation (No. FOSC 78 du 22.04.2022, Publ. 1005456890).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Wicki, Christian, de Escholzmatt-Marbach, à Sierre, membre du conseil de fondation, avec signature collective à deux avec le président.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Dayer, Julie, de Hérémence, à Lausanne, membre du conseil de fondation, avec signature collective à deux avec le président.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.