Reports for Fondation Edith Delachaux
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Fondation Edith Delachaux
- Fondation Edith Delachaux has its legal headquarters in Randogne, is active and operates in the sector «Other social services».
- The management of the organization Fondation Edith Delachaux, which was founded on the 12.10.1993, consists of 6 persons.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 02.08.2022.
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-114.464.671.
Management (6)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Aurélia Bétrisey,
Jean Pierre Emmanuel Lugon,
Sophie Salamin Bonnemain,
Jean-Pierre Gunter,
Paul-Albert Clivaz
newest authorized signatories
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
12.10.1993
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Crans-Montana
Commercial Registry Office
VS
Commercial register number
CH-626.7.003.317-1
UID/VAT
CHE-114.464.671
Sector
Other social services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Venir en aide aux couples les plus défavorisés matériellement, moralement et spirituellement dont un des conjoints se trouve dans un home et dont le domicile est dans l'une des communes du district de Sierre
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fiduciaire de Crans-Montana (FCM) SA | Crans-Montana | 08.01.2018 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fiduciaire Valérie Favre | Crans-Montana | 30.06.2008 | 07.01.2018 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Fondation Delachaux Edith
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Fondation Edith Delachaux
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005533490, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
Fondation Edith Delachaux, à Crans-Montana, CHE-114.464.671, fondation (No. FOSC 121 du 25.06.2020, Publ. 1004920673).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Epiney, Luc, de Anniviers, à Anniviers, membre, sans droit de signature;
Germann, Louis Dominique, de Adelboden, à Sierre, membre, sans droit de signature;
Salamin Plaschy, Isabelle, de Anniviers, à Veyras, membre, sans droit de signature.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Bétrisey, Aurélia, de Saint-Léonard, à Sion, membre du conseil de fondation, sans droit de signature;
Lugon, Jean Pierre Emmanuel, de Sion, à Savièse, membre du conseil de fondation, sans droit de signature.
Publication number: HR02-1004920673, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
Fondation Edith Delachaux, à Crans-Montana, CHE-114.464.671, fondation (No. FOSC 4 du 08.01.2018, Publ. 3973667).
Nouvelle adresse:
Chemin Paul Hindemith 19, 3975 Randogne.
Publication number: 3973667, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
Fondation Edith Delachaux, à Crans-Montana, CHE-114.464.671, fondation (No. FOSC 4 du 06.01.2017, Publ. 3266937).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
BUREAU FIDUCIAIRE VALERIE FAVRE, à Lens, organe de révision.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Fiduciaire de Crans-Montana (FCM) SA (CHE-106.999.214), à Crans-Montana, organe de révision.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.