Address
Chemin des Fossaux 10
1443 Villars-sous-Champvent
Reports for Flyermaps Sàrl
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Flyermaps Sàrl
- Flyermaps Sàrl is currently active and the industry «Architectural and engineering activities». The legal headquarters are in Villars-sous-Champvent.
- There are 4 active persons registered in the management.
- On the 20.02.2017 the commercial register entry of the company was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The reported UID is CHE-337.153.088.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
07.01.2013
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Champvent
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.1.116.156-5
UID/VAT
CHE-337.153.088
Sector
Architectural and engineering activities
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
La société a pour but le développement et la commercialisation d'outils dédiés à la cartographie, notamment de produits et données cartographiques (pour but complet cf. statuts).
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Flyermaps Sàrl
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 3358769, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Flyermaps Sàrl, à Champvent, CHE-337.153.088 (FOSC du 21.06.2016, p. 0/2903131). Girod Eric est maintenant à Cebu City (Philippines).
Publication number: 2903131, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Flyermaps Sàrl, à Champvent, CHE-337.153.088 (FOSC du 16.05.2014, p. 0/1506539). Statuts modifiés le 8 juin 2016. Augmentation du capital social.
Nouveau capital social:
CHF 31'400, divisé en 314 parts sociales de CHF 100.
Nouvel associé:
Girod Eric, de Cuarny, à Lutry, avec 104 parts de CHF 100, gérant avec signature individuelle.
Publication number: 1506539, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Flyermaps Sàrl, à Champvent, CHE-337.153.088 (FOSC du 19.12.2013, p. 0/7225834). Volken Flavien, qui n'est plus associé-gérant et dont la signature est radiée, cède ses 70 parts de CHF 100 par 34 parts de CHF 100 à l'associé-gérant président Huguenin Johann, par 34 parts de CHF 100 à l'associé-gérant du Brusle de Rouvroy Eric, et par 2 parts de CHF 100 à Weiss Céline, de Gorgier, à Bretigny-sur-Morrens, nouvelle associée avec 2 parts de CHF 100, sans signature. Huguenin Johann et du Brusle de Rouvroy Eric, maintenant titulaires, chacun, de 104 parts de CHF 100, signent désormais invididuellement.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.