Address
c/o Flugplatz Sitterdorf
8589 Sitterdorf
Reports for Flugbetriebs AG Sitterdorf
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Flugbetriebs AG Sitterdorf
- Flugbetriebs AG Sitterdorf in Sitterdorf is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Other transportation services». Flugbetriebs AG Sitterdorf is active.
- The company was founded on 16.08.1967.
- On the 09.11.2023 the commercial register entry of the company was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The company Flugbetriebs AG Sitterdorf is registered under the UID CHE-105.773.630.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
16.08.1967
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Zihlschlacht-Sitterdorf
Commercial Registry Office
TG
Commercial register number
CH-440.3.004.029-8
UID/VAT
CHE-105.773.630
Sector
Other transportation services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Durchführung des Flugbetriebes auf dem Flugplatz Sitterdorf sowie allfälligen anderen Flugplätzen in der Schweiz oder im Ausland, Ausführung von gewerbsmässigen Flügen im nicht regelmässigen Luftverkehr gemäss Allgemeiner Betriebsbewilligung des Eidgenössischen Luftamtes (unter Einschluss der Ausführung von Rundflügen, der gelegentlichen Beförderung von Personen und Sachen, dem Absetzen von Fallschirmabspringern und der Durchführung von Flügen für die Erstellung von photographischen, Film- und Vermessungsaufgaben sowie von Charterflügen als Charterer und Vercharterer), Kauf, Verkauf, Reparatur und Unterhalt von Flugzeugen, Veranstaltung von Kursen, Vorträgen, Veranstaltungen und Wettbewerben etc. Die Gesellschaft kann Unternehmen gleicher oder ähnlicher Art erwerben, sich an solchen Unternehmen beteiligen und Immobilien erwerben, belasten und veräussern.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
RT Treuhand AG | Altstätten | 02.02.2021 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Brunner & Schär Treuhand AG | Aadorf | 05.11.2013 | 01.02.2021 | |
inspecta experts ag | St. Gallen | <2004 | 11.02.2009 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Flugbetriebs AG Sitterdorf
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005881202, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
Flugbetriebs AG Sitterdorf, in Zihlschlacht-Sitterdorf, CHE-105.773.630, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 175 vom 09.09.2021, Publ. 1005288041).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Hefel, Willi, von Elsau, in Rickenbach Sulz (Rickenbach (ZH)), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Schönenberg an der Thur (Kradolf-Schönenberg)].
Publication number: HR02-1005288041, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
Flugbetriebs AG Sitterdorf, in Zihlschlacht-Sitterdorf, CHE-105.773.630, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 22 vom 02.02.2021, Publ. 1005089792).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Holdener, Manfred, von Glarus, in Thal, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Brocker, Markus [keine Mutation, Aktualisierung der Funktionsbezeichnung], von Altstätten, in St. Gallen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Brocker, Markus, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Rutz, Marco [keine Mutation, Aktualisierung der Funktionsbezeichnung], von Nesslau, in Wittenbach, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Rutz, Marco, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: HR02-1005089792, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
Flugbetriebs AG Sitterdorf, in Zihlschlacht-Sitterdorf, CHE-105.773.630, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 193 vom 05.10.2020, Publ. 1004992607).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Brunner & Schär Treuhand AG (440.3.002.052-8), in Aadorf, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
RT Treuhand AG (CHE-101.063.794), in Altstätten SG (Altstätten), Revisionsstelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.