Age of the company
-Turnover in CHF
-Capital in CHF
-Employees
-Active brands
-Reports for Fiduciaire F. Rouiller, M. Proz, R. Tacchini et A. Veuthey SNC
There is no information available because this company has been deleted.
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierCommercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
18.01.1980
Deletion from the commercial register
07.01.2011
Legal form
General partnership
Legal headquarters of the company
Sion
Commercial Registry Office
VS
Commercial register number
CH-626.2.005.902-6
UID/VAT
CHE-102.546.776
Sector
Fiduciary services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Organisation et tenue de toute comptabilité, affaires fiscales, missions d'arbitrage, révisions et expertises, gestion et représentation d'intérêts, travaux d'encaissement et d'une manière générale, tout mandat fiduciaire.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Fiduciaire Rouiller F., Proz M., Tacchini R. et Veuthey A. SNC
- Fiduciaire Rouiller & Cie
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Fiduciaire F. Rouiller, M. Proz, R. Tacchini et A. Veuthey SNC
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 5974800, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
Fiduciaire F. Rouiller, M. Proz, R. Tacchini et A. Veuthey SNC, à Sion, CH-626.2.005.902-6, société en nom collectif (No. FOSC 50 du 13.03.1995, p. 1405). La liquidation étant terminée, la société est radiée.
Commercial Registry Office Valais
Fiduciaire Rouiller & Cie, à Sion. Société en nom collectif (FOSC du 8.6.1993, no108, p.2965).
Nouvelle raison sociale:
Fiduciaire F. Rouiller, M. Proz, R. Tacchini et A. Veuthey SNC.
Commercial Registry Office Valais
Fiduciaire Rouiller & Cie, à Sion . Société en nom collectif (FOSC du 4.12.1992, no236, p.5667). L'associé Roger Monnet s'est retiré de la société dès le 1.1.1993, sa signature est radiée.