Reports for Fehr Group AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Fehr Group AG
- Fehr Group AG has its legal headquarters in Winterthur and is active. It is a Company limited by shares (AG) and active in the industry «Operation of other financial institutions».
- Fehr Group AG was founded on 02.03.2007.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 30.05.2024.
- The company is registered in the commercial register of the Canton of ZH under the UID CHE-113.479.345.
- The address is identical with 8 other active companies. These include: Autoteile Winterthur GmbH, ESCORT Energietechnik AG, Fehr Lagerlogistik AG.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
02.03.2007
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Winterthur
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.4.035.020-6
UID/VAT
CHE-113.479.345
Sector
Operation of other financial institutions
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Beteiligung an Unternehmen sowie die Verwaltung des Geschäftsvermögens. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Ledergerber Revisions GmbH | Gossau (SG) | 04.08.2021 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Consultive Revisions AG | Winterthur | 31.10.2018 | 03.08.2021 | |
Budliger Treuhand AG | Zürich | 31.01.2008 | 30.10.2018 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Skyline Parking AG
- SKYLINE Innovations GmbH
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Fehr Group AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006043317, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Fehr Group AG, in Winterthur, CHE-113.479.345, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 207 vom 25.10.2022, Publ. 1005589954).
Fusion:
Übernahme der Aktiven und Passiven der ML Holding AG, in Winterthur (CHE-113.372.411), gemäss Fusionsvertrag vom 07.05.2024 und Bilanz per 31.12.2023. Aktiven von CHF 4'498'154.00 und Passiven (Fremdkapital) von CHF 3'570.00 gehen auf die übernehmende Gesellschaft über. Da die übernehmende Gesellschaft sämtliche Aktien der übertragenden Gesellschaft hält, findet weder eine Kapitalerhöhung noch eine Aktienzuteilung statt.
Publication number: HR02-1005589954, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Fehr Group AG, in Winterthur, CHE-113.479.345, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 149 vom 04.08.2021, Publ. 1005264071).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Ruesch, Martin, von Oftringen, in Gaiserwald, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, Sekretär (Nichtmitglied), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Lehner, Thomas, von Rorschacherberg, in Dinhard, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005264071, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Fehr Group AG, in Winterthur, CHE-113.479.345, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 35 vom 19.02.2021, Publ. 1005105070).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Bleiker, Jakob, von Ebnat-Kappel, in Winterthur, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Guggenheim, Oliver, von Endingen, in Kilchberg ZH, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Stutz, Fridolin, von Islisberg, in Lufingen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Consultive Revisions AG (CHE-105.253.715), in Winterthur, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Kuhlow, Stefan, von Weinfelden, in Märstetten, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Ott, Maik, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Leverkusen (DE), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Ledergerber Revisions GmbH (CHE-115.980.656), in Gossau (SG), Revisionsstelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.