Marcel Lehner
domiciled in Ebnat-Kappel, from Niederhelfenschwil Active mandates: Stiftung Ferienhaus Bos-cha Ebnat-Kappel Connected persons: Peter Josef Giger, Jonas Giezendanner, Sandra Steiner-Schmid and more You can stay up to date through "Marcel Lehner", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Marcel Lehner"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Marcel Lehner", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Marcel Lehner"
|
|
Marcel Lehner
domiciled in Dinhard, from Rorschacherberg Active mandates: Lehner-Batliner GmbH, PARKING PROPERTIES AG and more Connected persons: Jris Lehner-Batliner, Thomas Lehner, Maik Georg Ott and more You can stay up to date through "Marcel Lehner", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Marcel Lehner"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Marcel Lehner", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Marcel Lehner"
|
Places where people with the name Marcel Lehner live
Sectors in which people with the name Marcel Lehner work
Operation of holiday cottages
Services regarding management consulting
Other transportation services
Operation of other financial institutions
Architectural and engineering activities
Operation of holiday cottages
Services regarding management consulting
Other transportation services
Operation of other financial institutions
Architectural and engineering activities
Private persons with the name Marcel Lehner
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Marcel Lehner
Publication number: HR02-1006063917, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
mp-tec ag, in Veltheim (AG), CHE-110.102.105, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 185 vom 23.09.2020, Publ. 1004984443).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Lehner, Marcel, von Rorschacherberg, in Dinhard, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005909354, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Enercapta GmbH, in Winterthur, CHE-114.615.800, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 131 vom 10.07.2017, S.0, Publ. 3633213).
Firma neu:
Enercapta GmbH in Liquidation. Die Gesellschaft ist mit Beschluss der Gesellschafterversammlung vom 17.11.2023 aufgelöst.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Lehner, Marcel, von Rorschacherberg, in Dinhard, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Polybloc AG (CHE-100.287.279), in Winterthur, Gesellschafterin, mit 200 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00 [bisher: Polybloc AG (CH-020.3.920.376-5)];
Kuhlow, Stefan, von Weinfelden, in Märstetten, Geschäftsführer, Liquidator, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1005589998, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
PARKING PROPERTIES AG, in Winterthur, CHE-335.426.565, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 242 vom 13.12.2019, Publ. 1004782289).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Ruesch, Martin, von Oftringen, in Abtwil, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Schmitter, Mathias, von Widnau, in Horn, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Lehner, Marcel, von Rorschacherberg, in Dinhard, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Lehner, Thomas, von Rorschacherberg, in Dinhard, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Ott, Maik, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Leverkusen (DE), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.