Reports for FAI AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout FAI AG
- FAI AG is currently active and the industry «Trading with machines». The legal headquarters are in Malans GR.
- FAI AG was founded on 16.01.1956.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 31.03.2017.
- The UID registered in the commercial register of GR is CHE-102.815.367.
- There are 4 other active companies registered at the same address. These include: Kialo AG, S.A. de la Communication Sécurisée SCS, SBI Consulting- und Verwaltungs- AG.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
16.01.1956
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Malans
Commercial Registry Office
GR
Commercial register number
CH-280.3.900.483-2
UID/VAT
CHE-102.815.367
Sector
Trading with machines
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Handel mit technischen und landwirtschaftlichen Produkten. Die Gesellschaft kann sich bei anderen Unternehmen beteiligen sowie Liegenschaften, Patente und Lizenzen erwerben, veräussern und verwalten.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
TNT Treuhand & Revisionen AG | Chur | 15.07.2013 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
TNT Treuhand & Revisionen, Thomas Peter Niederer, eidg. dipl. Treuhandexperte | Chur | 06.05.2011 | 14.07.2013 | |
Wirtschafts-Treuhand AG | Basel | <2004 | 05.05.2011 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- FAI AG.
- Faiag AG für Forschung und Industrie
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: FAI AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 3438531, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden, (350)
FAI AG, in Malans, CHE-102.815.367, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 162 vom 25.08.2014, Publ. 1678377).
Domizil neu:
Jeninserstrasse 18, 7208 Malans GR.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Möller, Henning, von Seengen, in Malans, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Möller, Bernhard, von Seengen, in Meisterschwanden, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: 1678377, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden, (350)
FAI AG, in Malans, CHE-102.815.367, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 134 vom 15.07.2013, Publ. 976053).
Domizil neu:
Nuttgasse 8, 7208 Malans GR.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
TNT Treuhand & Revisionen AG (CHE-221.180.334), in Chur, Revisionsstelle [bisher: TNT Treuhand & Revisionen AG (CH-350.3.011.687-0)].
Publication number: 976053, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden, (350)
FAI AG, in Malans, CH-280.3.900.483-2, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 88 vom 06.05.2011, Publ. 6150272).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
TNT Treuhand & Revisionen, Thomas Peter Niederer, eidg. dipl. Treuhandexperte (CH-350.1.009.455-6), in Chur, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
TNT Treuhand & Revisionen AG (CH-350.3.011.687-0), in Chur, Revisionsstelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.