Reports for Elektro Zurbrügg AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Elektro Zurbrügg AG
- Elektro Zurbrügg AG is active in the industry «Other construction» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Hondrich.
- The management consists of 4 persons. The company was founded on 20.04.2009.
- On the 12.05.2022 the commercial register entry of the company was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The reported UID is CHE-114.816.557.
Management (4)
newest board members
Florian Jutzi,
Priska Hebler-Müller,
Beatrice Plüss-Gfeller,
Stefan Hebler
newest authorized signatories
Florian Jutzi,
Priska Hebler-Müller,
Beatrice Plüss-Gfeller,
Stefan Hebler
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
20.04.2009
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Spiez
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-036.3.044.351-0
UID/VAT
CHE-114.816.557
Sector
Other construction
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt: Erstellung, Unterhalt und Service von Elektro- und Telematikinstallationen aller Art; Handel, Installation und Unterhaltsdienst aller Elektro- und Telematik-Geräte und Haustechnik-Anlagen. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen errichten, sich an andern Unternehmungen des In- und Auslandes beteiligen, gleichartige oder verwandte Unternehmen erwerben oder sich mit solchen zusammenschliessen, Grundstücke erwerben und veräussern sowie alle Geschäfte eingehen und Verträge abschliessen, die geeignet sind, den Zweck der Gesellschaft zu fördern, oder die direkt oder indirekt damit im Zusammenhang stehen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
von Kaenel Treuhand AG | Aeschi bei Spiez | 14.09.2015 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
von Kaenel Treuhand | Aeschi bei Spiez | 20.04.2009 | 13.09.2015 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Elektro Zurbrügg AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005471739, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Elektro Zurbrügg AG, in Spiez, CHE-114.816.557, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 79 vom 25.04.2019, Publ. 1004616796).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Zurbrügg, Hans-Ulrich, von Frutigen, in Hondrich (Spiez), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Plüss-Gfeller, Beatrice, von Bern, in Faulensee (Spiez), Mitglied und Sekretärin des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied und Sekretärin des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung];
Hebler-Müller, Priska, von Bern und Hasle bei Burgdorf, in Krattigen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Jutzi, Florian, von Linden, in Thun, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1004616796, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Elektro Zurbrügg AG, in Spiez, CHE-114.816.557, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 145 vom 28.07.2016, Publ. 2978141).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Zurbrügg-Jenni, Ruth, von Frutigen, in Hondrich (Spiez), Mitglied und Sekretärin, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Hebler, Stefan, von Bern, in Krattigen, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Plüss-Gfeller, Beatrice, von Bern, in Faulensee (Spiez), Mitglied und Sekretärin des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Zurbrügg, Hans-Ulrich, von Frutigen, in Hondrich (Spiez), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: 2978141, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Elektro Zurbrügg AG, in Spiez, CHE-114.816.557, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 177 vom 14.09.2015, Publ. 2370839).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Hebler, Stefan, von Bern, in Krattigen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: ohne eingetragene Funktion, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.