Reports for Elektro Kontrollen Zug AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Elektro Kontrollen Zug AG
- Elektro Kontrollen Zug AG has its legal headquarters in Zug and is active. It operates in the sector «Other construction».
- Elektro Kontrollen Zug AG has 2 persons entered in its management.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 29.07.2021. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- The company's UID is CHE-116.088.254.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
14.10.2010
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Zug
Commercial Registry Office
ZG
Commercial register number
CH-170.3.035.013-7
UID/VAT
CHE-116.088.254
Sector
Other construction
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Durchführung von Sicherheitskontrollen von elektrischen Anlagen, Anbieten von energietechnischen Beratungen und Optimierungen wie Ausführung von unabhängigen Expertisen; vollständige Zweckumschreibung gemäss Statuten.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Elektro Kontrollen Zug AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005260565, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
Elektro Kontrollen Zug AG, in Zug, CHE-116.088.254, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 90 vom 10.05.2011, S.0, Publ. 6154396).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Pfiffner, Markus, von Zug, in Zug, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Pfiffner, Michael, von Zug, in Zug, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Rüegg, Kurt, von Eschenbach (SG), in Rifferswil, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: von St. Gallenkappel, in Zug];
Rüegg, Irene, von Eschenbach (SG), in Rifferswil, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: 6154396, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
Elektro Kontrollen Zug AG, in Zug, CH-170.3.035.013-7, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 204 vom 20.10.2010, S. 17, Publ. 5861110).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Rüegg, Kurt, von St. Gallenkappel, in Zug, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Eschlikon].
Publication number: 5861110, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
Elektro Kontrollen Zug AG, in Zug, CH-170.3.035.013-7, Landhausweg 1, 6300 Zug, Aktiengesellschaft (Neueintragung).
Statutendatum:
06.10.2010.
Zweck:
Durchführung von Sicherheitskontrollen von elektrischen Anlagen, Anbieten von energietechnischen Beratungen und Optimierungen wie Ausführung von unabhängigen Expertisen;
vollständige Zweckumschreibung gemäss Statuten.
Aktienkapital:
CHF 100'000.00.
Liberierung Aktienkapital:
CHF 100'000.00.
Aktien:
10'000 vinkulierte Namenaktien zu CHF 10.00.
Publikationsorgan:
SHAB. Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre erfolgen schriftlich, per E-Mail oder durch Telefax an die im Aktienbuch eingetragenen Adressen.
Vinkulierung:
Die Übertragbarkeit der Namenaktien ist nach Massgabe der Statuten beschränkt. Gemäss Erklärung des Verwaltungsrates vom 06.10.2010 untersteht die Gesellschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision.
Eingetragene Personen:
Rüegg, Kurt, von St. Gallenkappel, in Eschlikon, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Pfiffner, Markus, von Zug, in Zug, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Pfiffner, Michael, von Zug, in Zug, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.