Reports for Electro-Müller SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Electro-Müller SA
- Electro-Müller SA is currently active and the industry «Trading in IT and communications products». The legal headquarters are in Brügg BE.
- Electro-Müller SA has 4 persons entered in its management.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 05.09.2024.
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the company Electro-Müller SA is the following: CHE-109.090.091.
- There are 2 other active companies registered at the same address. These include: CG Brügg GmbH, EMB Motoren Holding AG.
Management (4)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Denise Ochsner,
Johann Pablo Messmer,
Stefan Hügi,
Marcel Ochsner
Executive board
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
11.07.2001
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Brügg
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-073.3.013.702-1
UID/VAT
CHE-109.090.091
Sector
Trading in IT and communications products
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
La société a pour but le commerce avec des appareils et systèmes électriques et électroniques. La société peut acquérir, détenir et aliéner des immeubles. Elle peut constituer des succursales et des filiales, participer à d'autres entreprises et exercer toute activité commerciale, financière et autres en rapport avec son but.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fiduco, Fiduciaire pour l'Industrie et le Commerce S.A. | Biel/Bienne | 22.05.2019 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fiduciaire Figema SA | Biel/Bienne | 21.01.2011 | 21.05.2019 | |
FHS Fidufisc SA | Biel/Bienne | 20.07.2007 | 20.01.2011 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Electro-Müller AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Electro-Müller SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006122290, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Electro-Müller SA, à Brügg, CHE-109.090.091, société anonyme (No. FOSC 30 du 13.02.2023, Publ. 1005676251).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Sorgen, Patrick, de Hermrigen, à Boswil, membre du conseil d'administration, avec signature individuelle.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Ochsner, Denise, de Eggiwil, à Weisslingen, membre du conseil d'administration, avec signature individuelle.
Publication number: HR02-1005676251, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Electro-Müller SA, à Brügg, CHE-109.090.091, société anonyme (No. FOSC 17 du 26.01.2021, Publ. 1005083153).
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Messmer, Johann Pablo, de Obersaxen Mundaun, à Leuzigen, membre de la direction, avec signature collective à deux.
Publication number: HR02-1005083153, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Electro-Müller SA, à Brügg, CHE-109.090.091, société anonyme (No. FOSC 97 du 20.05.2020, Publ. 1004893492).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Eichenberger, Philippe, de Beinwil am See, à Corcelles BE, membre de la direction, avec signature collective à deux;
Knöpfel, Philippe, de Hundwil, à Ipsach, membre de la direction, avec signature collective à deux.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.