Address
Route de la Petite-Corniche 13
1095 Lutry
Reports for eeproperty SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout eeproperty SA
- eeproperty SA has its legal headquarters in Lutry and is active. It operates in the sector «IT services».
- The management of the company eeproperty SA, which was founded on the 22.07.2015, consists of 7 persons.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 03.04.2024.
- The reported UID is CHE-426.445.995.
- There are currently 2 trademarks or applications for the company eeproperty SA in the IPI database.
Management (7)
newest board members
Maël Perret,
Melvin Da Costa,
Hans Peter Stamm,
Alain Jouffrey
newest authorized signatories
Melvin Da Costa,
Céline Borgeaud,
Dani Pinto Caseiro,
Alain Jouffrey,
Christophe Haldi
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
22.07.2015
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Lutry
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.1.162.272-4
UID/VAT
CHE-426.445.995
Sector
IT services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
La société a pour but de concevoir, produire et commercialiser tout produit ou service relatif à la logistique et à l'organisation des immeubles, des villes et de la mobilité, y compris la coopération entre personnes physiques ou morales dans ce contexte (pour but complet cf. statuts).
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Ofico Fiduciaire SA | Lausanne | 17.03.2023 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- eeproperty AG
- eeproperty Ltd
Ownership structure
Holdings
Trademarks
Trademark | Registration date | Status | Number |
---|---|---|---|
SHAREMAN | 21.01.2021 | active | 14051/2020 |
Volta | 23.12.2020 | active | 08578/2020 |
Newest SOGC notifications: eeproperty SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005999804, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
eeproperty SA, à Lutry, CHE-426.445.995 (FOSC du 07.08.2023, p. 0/1005811349). Perret Maël, de Essertines-sur-Yverdon, à Genève, est membre du conseil d'administration, sans signature.
Publication number: HR02-1005811349, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
eeproperty SA, à Pully, CHE-426.445.995 (FOSC du 17.03.2023, p. 0/1005703469). Statuts modifiés le 29.06.2023. Siège transféré à Lutry.
Nouvelle adresse:
Route de la Petite-Corniche 13, 1095 Lutry. Augmentation ordinaire du capital-actions.
Nouveau capital-actions entièrement libéré:
CHF 258'500, divisé en 25'850'000 actions nominatives de CHF 0.01, avec restrictions quant à la transmissibilité selon statuts. L'assemblée générale a introduit une clause statutaire relative à une augmentation conditionnelle du capital par décision du 29.06.2023. Pour les détails, voir les statuts. Bonvin Alexandre n'est plus administrateur;
sa signature est radiée. Haldi Christophe est maintenant à Lutry. Da Costa Melvin, de France, à Evian-les-Bains (France), est membre du conseil d'administration avec signature collective à deux.
Publication number: HR02-1005703469, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
eeproperty SA, à Pully, CHE-426.445.995 (FOSC du 27.09.2021, p. 0/1005299484). Radiation de la mention relative à la renonciation à l'organe de révision.
Organe de révision:
Ofico Fiduciaire SA (CHE-107.021.222), à Lausanne.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.