Reports for Editions du Parvis SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Editions du Parvis SA
- Editions du Parvis SA with its legal headquarters in Hauteville is active. Editions du Parvis SA operates in the sector «Operation of a publishing agency (analog/digital)».
- The management consists of 2 persons. The company was founded on 04.12.1968.
- On the 18.12.2019 the commercial register entry of the company was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The company is registered in the commercial register FR under the UID CHE-107.769.869.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
04.12.1968
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Hauteville
Commercial Registry Office
FR
Commercial register number
CH-217.0.430.370-3
UID/VAT
CHE-107.769.869
Sector
Operation of a publishing agency (analog/digital)
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
La création et l'exploitation d'une maison d'éditions, impressions de tous genres, vente de livres et revues en gros et détail, et toutes opérations en rapport avec ce but. Achat et vente de matériel photo, audio et vidéo ainsi que d'objets de piété.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fiduciaire Marc Gobet SA | Romont (FR) | 18.12.2019 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fiduciaire de La Tour SA | Broc | 29.12.2009 | 17.12.2019 | |
Fiduciaire Bernard Charrière | Bulle | <2004 | 28.12.2009 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Parvisverlag AG
- Edizione Parvis SA
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Editions du Parvis SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004786614, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
Editions du Parvis S.A., à Hauteville, CHE-107.769.869 (FOSC du 19.12.2013, p. 0/7225826).
Adresse précise:
Route de l'Eglise 71, 1648 Hauteville. Fiduciaire de La Tour S.A. (CH-217-0430969-7) n'est plus organe de révision.
Personnes inscrites modifiées:
Castella Jean-Marie, administrateur président, signature collective à deux, nom précis Castella Jean Marie, maintenant de Haut-Intyamon (fusion de communes);
Castella Etienne, administrateur secrétaire, signature collective à deux, nom précis Castella Etienne Joseph, maintenant de Haut-Intyamon (fusion de communes).
Nouvel organe de révision:
Fiduciaire Marc Gobet SA (CHE-108.155.049), à Romont FR.
Publication number: 5417322, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
Editions du Parvis S.A., à Hauteville, CH-217-0430370-3, la création et l'exploitation d'une maison d'éditions, etc. (FOSC du 13.02.1997, p. 978). Fiduciaire Bernard Charrière n'est plus organe de révision.
Nouvel organe de révision:
Fiduciaire de La Tour S.A. (CH-217-0430969-7), à Broc.
Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
Editions du Parvis S.A. (Parvisverlag A.G.) (Edizioni Parvis S.A.), à Hauteville (FOSC du 8.03.1994, no47, p.1282). Jean-Marie Castella, de Neirivue, à Hauteville, inscrit comme membre et directeur, devient président;
Etienne Castella, de Neirivue, Hauteville, inscrit comme membre et directeur, devient secrétaire. Ils engagent la société par leur signature collective à deux. André Castella et Marie-Anne Castella ont démissionné;
leurs pouvoirs sont éteints et leur signature est radiée.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.