Reports for Edelverse GmbH
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Edelverse GmbH
- Edelverse GmbH has its legal headquarters in Kriens and is active. It is a Limited liability company and active in the industry «IT services».
- The management consists of one person. The company was founded on 03.02.2022.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 02.07.2024.
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the company Edelverse GmbH is the following: CHE-348.907.733.
- acokom GmbH, ARLC-Hauswartungen GmbH, Bonum Sport KlG have the same address as Edelverse GmbH.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
03.02.2022
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Kriens
Commercial Registry Office
LU
Commercial register number
CH-100.4.813.650-7
UID/VAT
CHE-348.907.733
Sector
IT services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Erbringung von Dienstleistungen in den Bereichen Softwareentwicklung, Webdesign, Hardware-Konfiguration, Beratung im Bereich EDV sowie den Handel mit und die Herstellung von Software und Hardware aller Art im In- und Ausland. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Zweigniederlassungen errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen, gleichartige oder verwandte Unternehmen erwerben oder sich mit solchen zusammenschliessen, Grundstücke erwerben, verwalten und veräussern sowie alle Geschäfte eingehen und Verträge abschliessen, die geeignet sind, den Zweck der Gesellschaft zu fördern, oder die direkt oder indirekt damit im Zusammenhang stehen.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Edelverse GmbH
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006072682, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Edelverse GmbH, in Kriens, CHE-348.907.733, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 209 vom 27.10.2023, Publ. 1005870527).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
von Allmen, Patrik, von Lauterbrunnen, in Interlaken, Gesellschafter, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung, mit 46 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schlattmann, Benjamin, von Basel, in Kriens, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 200 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00 [bisher: mit 154 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00].
Publication number: HR02-1005870527, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Edelverse GmbH, in Kriens, CHE-348.907.733, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 40 vom 27.02.2023, Publ. 1005687884).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schlattmann, Benjamin, von Basel, in Kriens, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 154 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00 [bisher: Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 134 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00];
von Allmen, Patrik, von Lauterbrunnen, in Interlaken, Gesellschafter, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung, mit 46 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00 [bisher: Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 66 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00].
Publication number: HR02-1005687884, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Edelverse GmbH, in Kriens, CHE-348.907.733, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 27 vom 08.02.2022, Publ. 1005399811).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Rota, David Lee, von Münchenstein, in Zürich, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 66 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schlattmann, Benjamin, von Basel, in Kriens, Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 134 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00 [bisher: mit 68 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.