Reports for Dörflinger Holding AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Dörflinger Holding AG
- Dörflinger Holding AG is a Company limited by shares (AG) with its legal headquarters in Turgi. Dörflinger Holding AG belongs to the industry «Operation of other financial institutions» and is currently active.
- The management has 5 active persons registered.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 19.06.2024.
- Dörflinger Holding AG is registered in the Canton of AG under the UID CHE-103.611.548.
- Companies with an identical address: Dörflinger Immobilien AG, Oberau Immobilien AG.
Management (5)
newest board members
Clarissa Dörflinger,
Arthur Dörflinger,
Dr. Paul Ernst Meier,
Dr. Eva Maria Dörflinger-Hejlek,
Dieter Egloff
newest authorized signatories
Clarissa Dörflinger,
Arthur Dörflinger,
Dr. Paul Ernst Meier,
Dr. Eva Maria Dörflinger-Hejlek,
Dieter Egloff
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
14.10.1997
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Baden
Commercial Registry Office
AG
Commercial register number
CH-400.3.018.856-0
UID/VAT
CHE-103.611.548
Sector
Operation of other financial institutions
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Halten von Beteiligungen an Finanz-, Handels- und Industrieunternehmen aller Art; kann Wertpapiere und Beteiligungen erwerben und veräussern, Finanzgeschäfte aller Art durchführen, insbesondere Darlehen gewähren sowie Grundstücke erwerben, halten und veräussern.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Widmer Alfons, eidg.dipl. Buchhalter, Treuhand und Revisionen | Untersiggenthal | <2004 | 10.11.2008 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Dörflinger Holding AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006061403, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Dörflinger Holding AG, in Baden, CHE-103.611.548, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 7 vom 11.01.2024, Publ. 1005931923).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Voser, Dr. Peter, von Baden und Brugg, in Baden, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005931923, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Dörflinger Holding AG, in Turgi, CHE-103.611.548, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 136 vom 16.07.2021, Publ. 1005251401).
Sitz neu:
Baden. [Gemeindefusion vom 01.01.2024].
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Dörflinger-Hejlek, Dr. Eva-Maria, von Val-de-Travers, in Baden, Präsidentin des Verwaltungsrates, Delegierte des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Turgi, Präsidentin des Verwaltungsrates, Delegierte des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Dörflinger, Arthur, von Val-de-Travers, in Baden, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Turgi];
Dörflinger, Clarissa, von Val-de-Travers, in Baden, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Turgi].
Publication number: HR02-1005251401, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Dörflinger Holding AG, in Turgi, CHE-103.611.548, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 251 vom 24.12.2020, Publ. 1005058087).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Dörflinger, Clarissa, von Val-de-Travers, in Turgi, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.