Reports for DMBA Holding AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout DMBA Holding AG
- DMBA Holding AG with its legal headquarters in Aarberg is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Operation of other financial institutions». DMBA Holding AG is active.
- The management of the company DMBA Holding AG consists of 2 persons. The foundation of the company took place on 23.12.2003.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 18.05.2021. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- In the commercial register the company DMBA Holding AG is registered under the UID CHE-110.361.598.
- Companies with an identical address: Bangerter Microtechnik AG, BTE Holding AG, Nevus AG.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
23.12.2003
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Aarberg
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-073.3.015.492-3
UID/VAT
CHE-110.361.598
Sector
Operation of other financial institutions
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Beteiligung an Gesellschaften aller Art. Die Gesellschaft kann Aktien, Genossenschaftsanteile und Stammanteile von Aktiengesellschaften und Gesellschaften mit beschränkter Haftung erwerben, verwalten und verkaufen und sämtliche Rechtsgeschäfte eingehen, die damit im Zusammenhang stehen. Sie kann sich an andern Unternehmungen des In- und Auslandes beteiligen, sowie Grundstücke erwerben oder weiterveräussern.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fidutax Wirtschaftsberatung AG | Biel/Bienne | 18.05.2021 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Meichtry Treuhand AG | Biel/Bienne | 24.10.2013 | 17.05.2021 | |
Ingold Treuhand AG | Biel/Bienne | <2004 | 23.10.2013 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: DMBA Holding AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005184122, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
DMBA Holding AG, in Aarberg, CHE-110.361.598, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 65 vom 02.04.2020, Publ. 1004864458).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Meichtry Treuhand AG (CHE-111.713.151), in Biel/Bienne, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Fidutax Wirtschaftsberatung AG (CHE-100.479.672), in Biel/Bienne, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: HR02-1004864458, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
DMBA Holding AG, in Aarberg, CHE-110.361.598, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 162 vom 25.08.2014, S.0, Publ. 1678139).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Bangerter, Daniel, von Lyss, in Bern, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bangerter, Andreas, von Lyss, in Zürich, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Bangerter, Marc, von Lyss, in Tüscherz-Alfermée (Twann-Tüscherz), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Ligerz, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: 1678139, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
DMBA Holding AG, in Aarberg, CHE-110.361.598, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 206 vom 24.10.2013, Publ. 1143507).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Meichtry Treuhand AG (CHE-111.713.151), in Biel/Bienne, Revisionsstelle [bisher: Meichtry Treuhand AG (CH-073.4.015.858-1)].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.