About DAS STIFTUNG
- The management of the company DAS STIFTUNG consists of 3 persons. The foundation of the company took place on 24.08.2009.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 14.12.2019.
- There are 22 other active companies registered at the same address. These include: AR 2020 Establishment, Ayinit Stiftung, BIPPOP STIFTUNG.
Management (3)
newest members of the supreme governing body
CWH Treuhand AG,
Johannes Anatol Eggenberger,
lic. iur. Martin Lothar Ernst-Otto Hörnig
newest authorized signatories
Johannes Anatol Eggenberger,
lic. iur. Martin Lothar Ernst-Otto Hörnig
Ownership structure
Holdings
Latest notifications for DAS STIFTUNG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 11493/2019, (1)
DAS STIFTUNG, in Vaduz, FL-0002.017.178-4, Eingetragene Stiftung.
Repräsentanz/Zustelladresse neu:
c/o CWH Treuhand AG, Kirchstrasse 54, 9491 Ruggell.
Erloschene Angaben zur Verwaltung:
Secura Treuhand AG, 9490 Vaduz, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Zinsli, lic.iur. Domenic, StA: Schweiz, 7000 Chur, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Angaben zur Verwaltung neu oder mutierend:
CWH Treuhand AG, 9491 Ruggell, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Hörnig, lic.iur. Martin Lothar Ernst-Otto, StA: Liechtenstein, 9491 Ruggell, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: 9490 Vaduz].
Publication number: 9441/2018, (1)
DAS STIFTUNG, in Vaduz, FL-0002.017.178-4.
Stiftung Repräsentanz/Zustelladresse neu:
c/o Secura Treuhand AG, Lettstrasse 37, 9490 Vaduz.
Erloschene Angaben zur Verwaltung:
Codex Services S.A., Panama, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Angaben zur Verwaltung neu oder mutierend:
Secura Treuhand AG, 9490 Vaduz, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Eggenberger, Johannes Anatol, StA: Schweiz, 9472 Grabs, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Zinsli, lic.iur. Domenic, StA: Schweiz, 7000 Chur, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 20229202, (1)
Handelsregister 13.09.2017, DAS STIFTUNG, Vaduz (FL-0002.017.178-4) Stiftung Name neu: DAS STIFTUNG. Statutenänderung lt. Beschluss des Stiftungsrates vom 05.09.2017.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.