Reports for Danke Emma GmbH
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Danke Emma GmbH
- Danke Emma GmbH is currently active and the industry «Recruiting agency services». The legal headquarters are in St. Gallen.
- The company was founded on 21.11.2019.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 23.01.2024.
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-431.389.434.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
21.11.2019
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
St. Gallen
Commercial Registry Office
SG
Commercial register number
CH-320.4.087.706-8
UID/VAT
CHE-431.389.434
Sector
Recruiting agency services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Vermittlung von Personal im Arbeitsverhältnis bei Dritten zur Betreuung von Personen, Haushalten und Liegenschaften sowie das Erbringen aller damit zusammenhängenden Dienstleistungen. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Sicherheiten für Verbindlichkeiten verbundener Gesellschaften abgeben.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Danke Emma GmbH
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005941594, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Danke Emma GmbH, in St. Gallen, CHE-431.389.434, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 14 vom 20.01.2023, Publ. 1005657782).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Stiegeler, Rolf, von Leutwil, in St. Gallen, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Mörschwil].
Publication number: HR02-1005657782, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Danke Emma GmbH, in St. Gallen, CHE-431.389.434, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 189 vom 29.09.2021, Publ. 1005301188).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Ulmer, Bernhard, österreichischer Staatsangehöriger, in Rankweil (AT), Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 100 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00;
Smrz, Thomas, österreichischer Staatsangehöriger, in Balgach, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 100 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
swiss holding ag (CHE-101.703.978), in St. Gallen, Gesellschafterin, mit 200 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00.
Publication number: HR02-1005301188, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Danke Emma GmbH, in St. Gallen, CHE-431.389.434, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 229 vom 26.11.2019, Publ. 1004768262).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Ulmer, Bernhard, österreichischer Staatsangehöriger, in Rankweil (AT), Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 100 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00 [bisher: mit 200 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00];
Smrz, Thomas, österreichischer Staatsangehöriger, in Balgach, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 100 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00 [bisher: in Eichberg, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, ohne Stammanteil].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.