Address
c/o Hans-Peter Meier
Stadelhoferstrasse 26
8001 Zürich
Reports for Cultur Prospectiv CP-Institut AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Cultur Prospectiv CP-Institut AG
- Cultur Prospectiv CP-Institut AG from Zürich operates in the sector «Research and development» and is active.
- Cultur Prospectiv CP-Institut AG was founded on 24.09.1990.
- The last commercial register change was made on 25.09.2019. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the company Cultur Prospectiv CP-Institut AG is the following: CHE-106.674.025.
- On the same address there are 4 other active companies registered. These include: FoodFor Labs AG, Stiftung zur Förderung sozialwissenschaftlicher Forschung über die Weltgesellschaft, TLCHIRO AG.
Management (3)
newest board members
Willi Meier,
Prof. Dr. Hans-Peter Meier,
Dr. Susanne Hohermuth
newest authorized signatories
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
24.09.1990
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Zürich
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.3.906.140-9
UID/VAT
CHE-106.674.025
Sector
Research and development
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Sozialwissenschaftliche Erforschung, Beratung und Ausarbeitung von zukunftsweisenden Projekten in wichtigen Problembereichen der Gesellschaft, so besonders der Kultur, Politik, Stadt und Regionen, Technik und Arbeit, Umwelt und Risiken, sowie die Publikation und Verbreitung wichtiger Resultate in der Oeffentlichkeit; kann sich an anderen, ihren Zielen entsprechenden Unternehmungen und Institutionen im In- und Ausland beteiligen, Zweigniederlassungen errichten, Immobilien kaufen, verwalten oder veräussern, soweit dies dem Gesellschaftszweck dient oder zu dienen geeignet ist.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Pro Saldo Treuhand AG | Kloten | <2004 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Cultur Prospectiv CP-Institut AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004723135, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Cultur Prospectiv CP-Institut AG, in Zürich, CHE-106.674.025, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 128 vom 08.07.2003, S.19, Publ. 1071098).
Domizil neu:
c/o Hans-Peter Meier, Stadelhoferstrasse 26, 8001 Zürich.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Walter, Dr. Therese, von Mümliswil-Ramiswil, in Zürich, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Meier, Willi, von Quarten, in Mels, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Meier, Dr. Hans-Peter, von Quarten, in Zürich, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Pro Saldo Treuhand AG (CHE-106.777.719), in Oberembrach, Revisionsstelle [bisher: Pro Saldo Treuhand AG].
Publication number: 1071098, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Cultur Prospectiv CP-Institut AG, in Zürich, Sozialwissenschaftliche Erforschung, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 197 vom 11.10.1999, S. 6946).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Walter, Dr. Therese, von Mümliswil-Ramiswil, in Zürich, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung];
Hohermuth, Dr. Susanne, von Erlen und Zürich, in Zürich, Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung [bisher: von Riedt TG und Zürich, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Cultur Prospectiv CP-Institut AG, in Z ü r i c h, Sozialwissenschaftliche Erforschung, Beratung und Ausarbeitung von zukunftsweisenden Projekten, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 187 vom 30.09.1997, S. 7152).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Fibrac AG, in Zürich, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Pro Saldo Treuhand AG, in Oberembrach, Revisionsstelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.