Reports for COM.CIERGE GmbH
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout COM.CIERGE GmbH
- COM.CIERGE GmbH in Cham is a Limited liability company from the sector «IT services». COM.CIERGE GmbH is active.
- The management of the company COM.CIERGE GmbH consists of 3 persons. The foundation of the company took place on 18.05.2018.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 18.12.2023.
- The company is registered in the commercial register of the Canton of ZG under the UID CHE-168.129.618.
- The IPI database currently contains 2 trademarks or applications for the company COM.CIERGE GmbH.
- On the same address there are 47 other active companies registered. These include: accoswiss ag, Acies Group AG, AI2C Technologies AG.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
18.05.2018
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Cham
Commercial Registry Office
ZG
Commercial register number
CH-170.4.015.616-0
UID/VAT
CHE-168.129.618
Sector
IT services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Vermittlung von Software sowie elektronischen Applikationen im Hotel-, Hostel- und Tourismusbereich sowie Erbringung sämtlicher damit zusammenhängender Dienstleistungen; vollständige Zweckumschreibung gemäss Statuten.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- myHotel Solution GmbH
Ownership structure
Holdings
Trademarks
Trademark | Registration date | Status | Number |
---|---|---|---|
05.05.2023 | active | 04199/2023 | |
11.07.2014 | active | 63292/2013 |
Newest SOGC notifications: COM.CIERGE GmbH
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005912533, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
COM.CIERGE GmbH, in Cham, CHE-168.129.618, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 224 vom 19.11.2018, Publ. 1004500544).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Rottet, Damien, von Val Terbi, in Cham, Gesellschafter, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung, mit 33 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 200.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Gisler, Dominik, von Schattdorf, in Winterthur, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 67 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 200.00 [bisher: mit 34 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 200.00];
Thomann, Michael, von Niederhelfenschwil, in Oberlunkhofen, Gesellschafter, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit 33 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 200.00 [bisher: Gesellschafter, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung];
Gisler, Clemens, von Schattdorf, in Neuchâtel, Zeichnungsberechtigter, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1004500544, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
myHotel Solution GmbH, in Cham, CHE-168.129.618, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 201 vom 17.10.2018, Publ. 1004478405).
Statutenänderung:
05.11.2018.
Firma neu:
COM.CIERGE GmbH.
Publication number: HR02-1004478405, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
myHotel Solution GmbH, in Cham, CHE-168.129.618, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 98 vom 24.05.2018, Publ. 4246195).
Statutenänderung:
04.10.2018. [Ferner Änderung nicht publikationspflichtiger Tatsachen].
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Gisler, Dominik, von Schattdorf, in Winterthur, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 34 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 200.00;
Rottet, Damien, von Val Terbi, in Cham, Gesellschafter, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung, mit 33 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 200.00 [bisher: Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit 10 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00];
Thomann, Michael, von Niederhelfenschwil, in Oberlunkhofen, Gesellschafter, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung, mit 33 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 200.00 [bisher: Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit 10 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.