Reports for Coiffure Haarmonie Lyss GmbH
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Coiffure Haarmonie Lyss GmbH
- Coiffure Haarmonie Lyss GmbH is currently active and the industry «Personal wellness and beauty services». The legal headquarters are in Lyss.
- The company was founded on 29.06.2007.
- The last commercial register change was made on 15.01.2020. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-113.713.096.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
29.06.2007
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Lyss
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-073.4.017.986-2
UID/VAT
CHE-113.713.096
Sector
Personal wellness and beauty services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den Betrieb eines Coiffeursalons. Die Gesellschaft ist befugt, sich an andern Unternehmen im In- und Ausland, die gleiche oder ähnliche Zwecke verfolgen, zu beteiligen, solche Unternehmungen zu erwerben oder zu pachten sowie alle Geschäfte durchzuführen, die mit dem Gesellschaftszweck direkt oder indirekt im Zusammenhang stehen oder ihn zu fördern geeignet sind. Die Gesellschaft kann Liegenschaften erwerben, verwalten und veräussern und Zweigniederlassungen im In- und Ausland errichten.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Coiffure Haarmonie Lyss GmbH
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004805049, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Coiffure Haarmonie Lyss GmbH, in Lyss, CHE-113.713.096, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 226 vom 20.11.2015, Publ. 2493183).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Bonaventura, Angela Lucia, italienische Staatsangehörige, in Lyss, Gesellschafterin, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 1'000.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Gerber, Sandra, von Langnau im Emmental, in Lyss, Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 20 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: mit 19 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00].
Publication number: 2493183, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Coiffure Haarmonie Lyss GmbH, in Lyss, CHE-113.713.096, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 172 vom 07.09.2015, Publ. 2359097).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Brunner, Susanne, von Seedorf (BE), in Biel/Bienne, Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit 10 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Gerber, Sandra, von Langnau im Emmental, in Lyss, Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 19 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: Gesellschafterin und Vorsitzende der Geschäftsführung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit 10 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00];
Bonaventura, Angela Lucia, italienische Staatsangehörige, in Lyss, Gesellschafterin, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 1'000.00.
Publication number: 2359097, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Coiffure Haarmonie Lyss GmbH, in Lyss, CHE-113.713.096, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 223 vom 16.11.2011, Publ. 6419114).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Gerber, Sandra, von Langnau im Emmental, in Lyss, Gesellschafterin und Vorsitzende der Geschäftsführung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit 10 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00;
Brunner, Susanne, von Seedorf BE, in Biel/Bienne, Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit 10 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin mit Einzelunterschrift und mit 20 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.