Reports for Chaubert AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Chaubert AG
- Chaubert AG has its legal headquarters in Unterseen, is active and operates in the sector «Other building work (incl. Interior finishing)».
- Chaubert AG was founded on 17.04.1979.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 10.10.2023. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- The company Chaubert AG is registered under the UID CHE-107.203.757.
Management (7)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Corinne Marusik-von Allmen,
Michael Kiser,
Mathias Ghelma,
Sandro Ghelma-Linder,
Dominik Ghelma
Executive board
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
17.04.1979
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Unterseen
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-092.3.003.057-7
UID/VAT
CHE-107.203.757
Sector
Other building work (incl. Interior finishing)
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Ausführung von Boden- und Wandbelagsarbeiten mit textilen und resilienten Belägen, Parkett, Laminat und Quarzsand, Handel mit Teppichen, Möbeln und Vorhängen sowie weiteren branchenspezifischen Produkten und Dienstleistungen; kann sich an anderen Unternehmungen beteiligen sowie Grundstücke erwerben, halten und veräussern.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
balli & partner treuhand ag | Matten bei Interlaken | 19.10.2009 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Treuhand Lüdin, Nachfolger Bruno Balli | Matten bei Interlaken | <2004 | 18.10.2009 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Chaubert AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005856561, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Chaubert AG, in Unterseen, CHE-107.203.757, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 85 vom 04.05.2021, Publ. 1005167920).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Marusik-von Allmen, Corinne, von Lauterbrunnen, in Meiringen, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien [bisher: von Allmen, Corinne].
Publication number: HR02-1005167920, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Chaubert AG, in Unterseen, CHE-107.203.757, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 57 vom 23.03.2021, Publ. 1005130568).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Kiser, Michael, von Sarnen, in Meiringen, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
von Allmen, Corinne, von Lauterbrunnen, in Meiringen, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005130568, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Chaubert AG, in Unterseen, CHE-107.203.757, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 12 vom 18.01.2018, Publ. 3998501).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Brügger, Peter, von Guttannen, in Meiringen, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.