Reports for cewas
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout cewas
- cewas is currently active and the industry «Religious, political or secular associations». The legal headquarters are in Willisau.
- cewas has 7 persons entered in its management.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 27.06.2024.
- In the commercial register the organization cewas is registered under the UID CHE-196.320.647.
- There are 6 other active companies that have registered an identical address. These include: Chardon Consult AG, DW Corp GmbH, Kulturland 21 GmbH.
Management (7)
newest members of the committee
newest authorized signatories
Reto Wey,
Sareen Malik,
Leonellha Siboney Barreto Dillon,
Amanda Ramona Ammann,
Aline Bussmann
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
27.10.2016
Legal form
Association
Legal headquarters of the company
Willisau
Commercial Registry Office
LU
Commercial register number
CH-100.6.802.777-9
UID/VAT
CHE-196.320.647
Sector
Religious, political or secular associations
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Der Zweck des Vereins cewas ist die Förderung von nachhaltigen Sozialunternehmen und innovativen Praktiken zur Lösung von Wasser- und Ressourcenproblemen, insbesondere für bedürftige Personengruppen in Entwicklungsländern. Der Fokus liegt dabei auf der fachlichen Unterstützung von Personen und Organisationen mittels Information, Ausbildung, Coaching und Vernetzung. Der Verein ist ausschliesslich gemeinnützig tätig, er verfolgt keine wirtschaftlichen oder Selbsthilfeziele.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
FIDURIA AG | Bern | 25.10.2022 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
TBO Revisions AG | Zürich | 01.11.2016 | 24.10.2022 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: cewas
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006068622, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
cewas, in Willisau, CHE-196.320.647, Verein (SHAB Nr. 207 vom 25.10.2022, Publ. 1005590137).
Statutenänderung:
08.06.2024.
Zweck neu:
Der Zweck des Vereins cewas ist die Förderung von nachhaltigen Sozialunternehmen und innovativen Praktiken zur Lösung von Wasser- und Ressourcenproblemen, insbesondere für bedürftige Personengruppen in Entwicklungsländern. Der Fokus liegt dabei auf der fachlichen Unterstützung von Personen und Organisationen mittels Information, Ausbildung, Coaching und Vernetzung. Der Verein ist ausschliesslich gemeinnützig tätig, er verfolgt keine wirtschaftlichen oder Selbsthilfeziele.
Mittel neu:
Mitgliederbeiträge;
private und öffentliche Beiträge und Unterstützungen;
Spenden und Vermächtnisse;
Erträge aus Sponsoring. [bisher: Mitgliederbeiträge;
private und öffentliche Beiträge und Unterstützungen;
Spenden und Vermächtnisse;
Verkauf von cewas Produkten;
Sponsoring und Trägerschaften.]. [Weitere Änderungen berühren keine publikationspflichtigen Tatsachen.].
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Bellwald, Sebastian, von Blatten und Kippel, in Bern, Mitglied des Vorstandes, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Wey, Reto, von Luzern, in Bottmingen, Mitglied des Vorstandes, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005590137, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
cewas, in Willisau, CHE-196.320.647, Verein (SHAB Nr. 127 vom 04.07.2022, Publ. 1005511079).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
TBO Revisions AG (CHE-103.352.097), in Zürich, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Malik, Sareen, kenianische Staatsangehörige, in Nairobi (KE), Mitglied des Vorstandes, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
FIDURIA AG (CHE-108.654.418), in Bern, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: HR02-1005511079, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
cewas, in Willisau, CHE-196.320.647, Verein (SHAB Nr. 224 vom 17.11.2020, Publ. 1005024257).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Barreto Dillon, Leonellha Siboney, deutsche Staatsangehörige, in Meyrin, mit Einzelprokura.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.