Reports for CeOPe Energietechnik GmbH
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout CeOPe Energietechnik GmbH
- CeOPe Energietechnik GmbH is active in the industry «Trading with various goods» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Kriessern.
- CeOPe Energietechnik GmbH has 3 persons entered in its management.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 08.11.2023.
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the company CeOPe Energietechnik GmbH is the following: CHE-330.475.533.
- Bodensee Invest AG, GM3 Holding AG, GM3 Immo AG have the same address as CeOPe Energietechnik GmbH.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
01.03.2022
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Oberriet (SG)
Commercial Registry Office
SG
Commercial register number
CH-320.4.093.754-3
UID/VAT
CHE-330.475.533
Sector
Trading with various goods
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Handel mit Sanitär-, Heizungs- und Lüftungstechnikanlagen, insbesondere Wärmepumpen, Fotovoltaik, Kälte-, Solar- und Klimaanlagen samt Ersatzteilen und Verbrauchsmaterialen; Planung, Installation, Inbetriebnahme, Wartung, Überprüfung, Montage, Reparatur und Instandsetzung im Zusammenhang mit den vorstehend bezeichneten Energiesystemen; von Handelsvertretungen; Beteiligung an anderen in- oder ausländischen Gesellschaften; Geschäfte aller Art, die sich unmittelbar oder mittelbar auf den Unternehmensgegenstand der Gesellschaft beziehen, ausgenommen Bankgeschäfte.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: CeOPe Energietechnik GmbH
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005879799, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
CeOPe Energietechnik GmbH, in Oberriet (SG), CHE-330.475.533, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 45 vom 04.03.2022, Publ. 1005420270).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
SHB Grosshandel AG (CHE-160.290.411), in Kriessern (Oberriet (SG)), Gesellschafterin, mit 125 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
GM3 Holding AG (CHE-168.711.445), in Kriessern (Oberriet (SG)), Gesellschafterin, mit 125 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00.
Publication number: HR01-1005420270, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
CeOPe Energietechnik GmbH, in Oberriet (SG), CHE-330.475.533, Alte Rheinstrasse 29, 9451 Kriessern, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (Neueintragung).
Statutendatum:
28.02.2022.
Zweck:
Handel mit Sanitär-, Heizungs- und Lüftungstechnikanlagen, insbesondere Wärmepumpen, Fotovoltaik, Kälte-, Solar- und Klimaanlagen samt Ersatzteilen und Verbrauchsmaterialen;
Planung, Installation, Inbetriebnahme, Wartung, Überprüfung, Montage, Reparatur und Instandsetzung im Zusammenhang mit den vorstehend bezeichneten Energiesystemen;
von Handelsvertretungen;
Beteiligung an anderen in- oder ausländischen Gesellschaften;
Geschäfte aller Art, die sich unmittelbar oder mittelbar auf den Unternehmensgegenstand der Gesellschaft beziehen, ausgenommen Bankgeschäfte.
Stammkapital:
CHF 20'000.00.
Publikationsorgan:
SHAB. Mitteilungen der Geschäftsführung an die Gesellschafter erfolgen per Brief, E-Mail oder Telefax an die im Anteilbuch verzeichneten Adressen. Gemäss Erklärung der Geschäftsführung vom 28.02.2022 untersteht die Gesellschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision.
Eingetragene Personen:
Ecker, Christof, österreichischer Staatsangehöriger, in Wels (AT), Gesellschafter, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung, mit 75 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00;
SHB Grosshandel AG (CHE-160.290.411) [ CH-320.4.072.329-0], in Kriessern (Oberriet (SG)), Gesellschafterin, mit 125 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00;
Grabherr, Michael, österreichischer Staatsangehöriger, in Rüthi (Rheintal) (Rüthi (SG)), Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.