Reports for Campus Mittelland AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Campus Mittelland AG
- Campus Mittelland AG with its legal headquarters in Luterbach is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Management of real estate portfolio properties». Campus Mittelland AG is active.
- Campus Mittelland AG was founded on 29.04.2002.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 09.11.2015.
- The company's UID is CHE-109.567.058.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
29.04.2002
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Luterbach
Commercial Registry Office
SO
Commercial register number
CH-241.3.002.198-3
UID/VAT
CHE-109.567.058
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Erwerb, Halten, Vermieten und Veräussern von Liegenschaften und Grundeigentum, Handel mit Waren aller Art sowie Erbringung von Dienstleistungen im Bildungssektor im In- und Ausland. Kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen, ferner Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fidutax Wirtschaftsberatung AG | Biel/Bienne | <2004 | 08.11.2015 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Campus Mittelland AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 2469739, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
Campus Mittelland AG, in Solothurn, CHE-109.567.058, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 207 vom 25.10.2013, Publ. 1146905).
Statutenänderung:
30.10.2015.
Sitz neu:
Luterbach.
Domizil neu:
Hauptstrasse 46, 4542 Luterbach.
Zweck neu:
Erwerb, Halten, Vermieten und Veräussern von Liegenschaften und Grundeigentum, Handel mit Waren aller Art sowie Erbringung von Dienstleistungen im Bildungssektor im In- und Ausland. Kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen, ferner Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen.
Mitteilungen neu:
Mitteilungen der Gesellschaft können den im Aktienbuch eingetragenen Aktionären schriftlich (per ordentliche oder elektronische Post) zugestellt werden. Mit Erklärung vom 30.10.2015 wurde auf die eingeschränkte Revision verzichtet.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Fidutax Wirtschaftsberatung AG, in Biel/Bienne, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: 1146905, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
Campus Mittelland AG, in Solothurn, CH-241.3.002.198-3, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 240 vom 09.12.2004, S. 14, Publ. 2580034).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Boll, Hansjörg, von Bachs, in Rüttenen, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Boll-Sommerhalder, Elsa Gertrud, von Bachs, in Günsberg, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Boll, Andreas, von Bachs, in Luterbach, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Vizepräsident des Verwaltungsrates und Geschäftsführer mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Boll-Fluri, Marianne, von Bachs und Luterbach, in Luterbach, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: 2580034, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
Campus Mittelland AG, in Solothurn, CH-241.3.002.198-3, An- und Verkauf, Ueberbauung, Verwaltung und Vermittlung von Grundeigentum usw., Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 84 vom 05.05.2003, S. 11, Publ. 975950).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Boll-Fluri, Marianne, von Bachs und Luterbach, in Luterbach, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Tschachtli-Fluri, Marianne, von Luterbach und Kerzers].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.