Reports for Camille Graeser-Stiftung
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Camille Graeser-Stiftung
- Camille Graeser-Stiftung has its legal headquarters in Zürich and is active. It is a Foundation and active in the industry «Religious, political or secular associations».
- Camille Graeser-Stiftung was founded on 14.11.1981.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 07.03.2023. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- Camille Graeser-Stiftung is registered in the Canton of ZH under the UID CHE-108.214.692.
Management (7)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Beatrice Maria Hatebur Wachsmuth,
Dr. Roman Vinzenz Kurzmeyer,
Margrit Huber-Bühler,
Ulrike Groos,
Hanspeter Kistler
newest authorized signatories
Beatrice Maria Hatebur Wachsmuth,
Dr. Roman Vinzenz Kurzmeyer,
Margrit Huber-Bühler,
Ulrike Groos,
Hanspeter Kistler
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
14.11.1981
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Zürich
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.7.901.656-8
UID/VAT
CHE-108.214.692
Sector
Religious, political or secular associations
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Gemeinnützige Unterstützung von kulturellen Bestrebungen aller Art, insbesondere Pflege, Förderung und Verbreitung des künstlerischen Werkes von Camille Graeser. Dazu gehört der Aufbau eines festen, unverkäuflichen Bestandes von Werken, die an geeigneten Orten der Oeffentlichkeit zugänglich gemacht werden. Zur Pflege der besonderen künstlerischen und geistigen Haltung, welche das Werk von Camille Graeser auszeichnet, können durch die Stiftung einerseits publizistische Aktivitäten verschiedenster Art entwickelt werden; andererseits können aus den zur Verfügung stehenden Mitteln im Geiste des Künstlers eigenständige und fortschrittliche künstlerische Leistungen Dritter durch Preise, Werkbeiträge, Ankäufe u.a. gefördert werden. Die Stiftung kann Stipendien an Kunsthistoriker, die sich mit dem Werk Camille Graesers befassen, ausrichten und Bemühungen zur Vertiefung des Verständnisses für die verschiedenen Aspekte konstruktiver Kunst unterstützen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Reto Zanoni, dipl. Wirtschaftsprüfer | Küsnacht (ZH) | 14.01.2016 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Beat E. Vogt, Dipl. Bücherexperte | Maur | 05.05.2008 | 13.01.2016 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Graeser Camille-Stiftung
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Camille Graeser-Stiftung
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005694242, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Camille Graeser-Stiftung, in Zürich, CHE-108.214.692, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 176 vom 10.09.2021, Publ. 1005288403).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Hatebur Wachsmuth, Beatrice Maria, von Basel, in Riehen, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005288403, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Camille Graeser-Stiftung, in Zürich, CHE-108.214.692, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 9 vom 14.01.2016, S.0, Publ. 2595483).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Scartazzini, Tanja, von Zürich und Bondo, in Zürich, Verwalterin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Kurzmeyer, Roman, von Reiden, in Basel, Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Huber-Bühler, Margrit, von Winterthur, in Seuzach, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Präsidentin des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: 2595483, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Camille Graeser-Stiftung, in Zürich, CHE-108.214.692, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 19 vom 29.01.2015, Publ. 1958605).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Kölla, Dr. Rudolf, von Zürich, in Zürich, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Beat E. Vogt, Dipl. Bücherexperte (CHE-107.165.915), in Maur, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Reto Zanoni, dipl. Wirtschaftsprüfer (CHE-105.588.529), in Küsnacht ZH, Revisionsstelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.