Address
Route du Creugenat 112f
2905 Courtedoux
Reports for Cadranor SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Cadranor SA
- Cadranor SA has its legal headquarters in Courtedoux, is active and operates in the sector «Manufacturing of measurement and control instruments».
- The company was founded on 10.07.1981 and has 2 persons in its management.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 17.11.2022.
- In the commercial register the company Cadranor SA is registered under the UID CHE-108.006.780.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
10.07.1981
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Courtedoux
Commercial Registry Office
JU
Commercial register number
CH-677.3.000.174-3
UID/VAT
CHE-108.006.780
Sector
Manufacturing of measurement and control instruments
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
La fabrication, l'achat et la vente de cadrans et de tous produits se rattachant à la boîte de montre. Elle peut se charger de toutes les opérations et toutes les fonctions de nature à développer son but ou qui ont un rapport direct ou indirect avec son objet. La société peut participer ou fusionner avec d'autres entreprises poursuivant un but semblable ou analogue et acquérir de telles entreprises en suisse et à l'étranger. Elle peut acheter et vendre des immeubles.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Treuhand Strasser AG Seeland | Biel/Bienne | 20.03.2018 |
Former auditor (3)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Treuhand Strasser AG | Biel/Bienne | 23.07.2007 | 19.03.2018 | |
Revistag Treuhand AG | Biel/Bienne | 06.07.2004 | 22.07.2007 | |
Fiduciaire Simon Kohler S.A. | Courgenay | <2004 | 05.07.2004 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Léchenne S.A.
- Raymond Léchenne SA
- Léchenne Raymond SA
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Cadranor SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005607318, Commercial Registry Office Jura, (670)
Cadranor SA, à Courtedoux, CHE-108.006.780, société anonyme (No. FOSC 53 du 17.03.2020, Publ. 1004854907).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Mahadumrongkul, Thamrong, de Thaïlande, à Bangkok (Thaïlande), membre, avec signature collective à deux;
Techawatanawana, Naruepon, de Thaïlande, à Bangkok (Thaïlande), membre, avec signature collective à deux.
Publication number: HR02-1004854907, Commercial Registry Office Jura, (670)
Cadranor SA, à Courtedoux, CHE-108.006.780, société anonyme (No. FOSC 216 du 07.11.2019, Publ. 1004754958).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Biedermann, Filomena, de Jens, à La Neuveville, avec procuration collective à deux.
Publication number: HR02-1004754958, Commercial Registry Office Jura, (670)
Cadranor SA, à Courtedoux, CHE-108.006.780, société anonyme (No. FOSC 55 du 20.03.2018, Publ. 4123811).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Broglie, Daniel, de Wegenstetten, à Cornol, membre, secrétaire, avec signature collective à deux, avec signature collective à deux.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Granito, Elio, de Bolligen, à Tüscherz-Alfermée (Twann-Tüscherz), président du conseil d'administration, directeur général, avec signature individuelle [précédemment: président, directeur général, avec signature collective à deux];
Granito, Romeo Bruno, ressortissant italien, à Biel/Bienne, membre et secrétaire du conseil d'administration, directeur, avec signature collective à deux.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.