Reports for Branca AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Branca AG
- Branca AG with its legal headquarters in Arlesheim is active. Branca AG operates in the sector «Painter».
- Branca AG has 4 persons entered in its management.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 05.10.2023.
- The reported UID is CHE-108.073.799.
- Companies with the same address as Branca AG: CWRR Immobilien AG, Fischer System Technik AG, Josef Gartner Switzerland AG.
Management (4)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Renato Lotti,
Sascha Zimmermann,
Delia Steiniger,
Roland Tschudin
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
07.03.1988
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Arlesheim
Commercial Registry Office
BL
Commercial register number
CH-280.3.911.901-2
UID/VAT
CHE-108.073.799
Sector
Painter
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Betrieb eines Maler- und Tapeziergeschäftes. Die Gesellschaft kann sämtliche Geschäfte tätigen, welche mit dem Gesellschaftszweck direkt oder indirekt in Zusammenhang stehen. Sie kann ihre Tätigkeit auf verwandte Branchen ausdehnen oder sich an ähnlichen Unternehmungen beteiligen, Liegenschaften erwerben, belasten oder veräussern.
Auditor
Former auditor (3)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
TRETOR AG | Liestal | 14.04.2009 | 31.10.2022 | |
Treuhand AG Liestal | Liestal | 08.04.2004 | 13.04.2009 | |
HMS-Treuhand AG in Liquidation | Rothenfluh | <2004 | 07.04.2004 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- G. Branca & Sohn AG
- Branca G. & Sohn AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Branca AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005853413, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Branca AG, in Arlesheim, CHE-108.073.799, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 72 vom 14.04.2023, Publ. 1005724012).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Branca-Ceretta, Giuseppe, von Böckten, in Frenkendorf, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Lotti, Renato, von Lugano, in Basel, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Zimmermann, Sascha, von Frenkendorf, in Frenkendorf, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: ohne eingetragene Funktion, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: HR02-1005724012, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Branca AG, in Arlesheim, CHE-108.073.799, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 212 vom 01.11.2022, Publ. 1005594884).
Domizil neu:
Niederfeldweg 1, 4144 Arlesheim.
Publication number: HR02-1005594884, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Branca AG, in Frenkendorf, CHE-108.073.799, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 82 vom 28.04.2022, Publ. 1005460582).
Statutenänderung:
20.10.2022.
Sitz neu:
Arlesheim.
Domizil neu:
c/o notavis gmbh, Bahnhofstrasse 16, 4144 Arlesheim.
Zweck neu:
Betrieb eines Maler- und Tapeziergeschäftes. Die Gesellschaft kann sämtliche Geschäfte tätigen, welche mit dem Gesellschaftszweck direkt oder indirekt in Zusammenhang stehen. Sie kann ihre Tätigkeit auf verwandte Branchen ausdehnen oder sich an ähnlichen Unternehmungen beteiligen, Liegenschaften erwerben, belasten oder veräussern.
Mitteilungen neu:
Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre erfolgen per Brief oder E-Mail an die im Aktienbuch verzeichneten Adressen. Gemäss Erklärung vom 20.10.2022 wurde auf die eingeschränkte Revision verzichtet. [Zweckanpassung aufgrund geänderter Eintragungspraxis (Art. 118 HRegV).].
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
TRETOR AG (CH-280.3.900.042-2), in Liestal, Revisionsstelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.