Reports for BEREUTER BODENAUFWERTUNG AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout BEREUTER BODENAUFWERTUNG AG
- BEREUTER BODENAUFWERTUNG AG with its legal headquarters in Volketswil is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Waste collection, treatment and disposal». BEREUTER BODENAUFWERTUNG AG is active.
- BEREUTER BODENAUFWERTUNG AG was founded on 16.04.2008.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 13.09.2024.
- The UID registered in the commercial register of ZH is CHE-114.262.788.
- Next to the company BEREUTER BODENAUFWERTUNG AG there are 9 other active companies with an identical address. These include: Baur & Cie AG, BEREUTER AG, BEREUTER BAU AG.
Management (7)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Reto Müller,
Lorenzo Spellecchia,
Alessandro Pol,
Marco Bereuter,
Hans-Peter Fritsche
Executive board
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
16.04.2008
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Volketswil
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.4.037.578-9
UID/VAT
CHE-114.262.788
Sector
Waste collection, treatment and disposal
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Ausführung von Bodenaufwertungen und sämtlichen damit verbundenen Nebenarbeiten. Die Gesellschaft kann alle Geschäfte eingehen und Verträge abschliessen, die geeignet sind, den Zweck der Gesellschaft zu fördern, oder die direkt oder indirekt damit in Zusammenhang stehen, ferner Zweigniederlassungen im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmungen beteiligen oder sich mit diesen zusammenschliessen. Sie kann Grundbesitz erwerben, mieten und vermieten, verwalten und veräussern.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
HPF Revisions- und Wirtschaftsberatungs-AG | Baden | 22.06.2021 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Egli Rekultivierungs- und Bau GmbH
- Egli Deponien GmbH
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: BEREUTER BODENAUFWERTUNG AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006128686, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
BEREUTER BODENAUFWERTUNG AG, in Volketswil, CHE-114.262.788, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 129 vom 05.07.2024, Publ. 1006076455).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Müller, Reto, von Zihlschlacht-Sitterdorf, in Wetzikon (ZH), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1006076455, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
BEREUTER BODENAUFWERTUNG AG, in Volketswil, CHE-114.262.788, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 41 vom 28.02.2024, Publ. 1005972273).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Spellecchia, Lorenzo, von Aadorf, in Pfungen, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005972273, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
BEREUTER BODENAUFWERTUNG AG, in Volketswil, CHE-114.262.788, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 118 vom 22.06.2021, Publ. 1005224253).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Neidhart, Jens, von Ramsen, in Wallisellen, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Pol, Alessandro, von Kaltbrunn, in Uster, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.