Reports for bau4ever AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout bau4ever AG
- bau4ever AG is currently active and the industry «Management of real estate portfolio properties». The legal headquarters are in Reinach AG.
- The company was founded on 19.04.2017 and has 4 persons in its management.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 12.10.2021. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- In the commercial register the company bau4ever AG is registered under the UID CHE-443.419.800.
- There are 3 other active companies that have registered an identical address. These include: Schröder AG, Schröder Baumanagement GmbH, Schröder Holding AG.
Management (4)
newest board members
Tobias Schröder,
Benno Kägi,
Gaetano De Masi,
Suzana Schröder-Djoric
newest authorized signatories
Tobias Schröder,
Benno Kägi,
Gaetano De Masi,
Suzana Schröder-Djoric
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
19.04.2017
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Reinach (AG)
Commercial Registry Office
AG
Commercial register number
CH-400.3.442.570-7
UID/VAT
CHE-443.419.800
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Handel mit sowie Erstellung, Renovation, Verwaltung, Vermietung und Vermittlung von Immobilien aller Art im In- und Ausland; kann im In- und Ausland Zweigniederlassungen errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen sowie andere Unternehmen erwerben oder erworbene Unternehmen verkaufen, Darlehen aufnehmen und gewähren, Garantien und andere Sicherheiten stellen, Immaterialgüterrechte erwerben, verwalten und verwerten, Wertschriften erwerben, verwalten und verkaufen sowie alle kommerziellen und finanziellen Transaktionen durchführen, die der Verwirklichung des Gesellschaftszwecks förderlich sein könnten.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: bau4ever AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005310620, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
bau4ever AG, in Menziken, CHE-443.419.800, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 104 vom 02.06.2020, Publ. 1004900911).
Statutenänderung:
29.09.2021.
Sitz neu:
Reinach (AG).
Domizil neu:
Schorenstrasse 6, 5734 Reinach AG.
Publication number: HR02-1004900911, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
bau4ever AG, in Menziken, CHE-443.419.800, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 78 vom 24.04.2017, Publ. 3482333).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Schranz, Christian, von Adelboden, in Baden, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schröder, Tobias, von Winterthur, in Beinwil am See, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Menziken];
Schröder, Suzana, von Winterthur, in Beinwil am See, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Menziken].
Publication number: 3482333, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
bau4ever AG, in Menziken, CHE-443.419.800, Hauptstrasse 2, 5737 Menziken, Aktiengesellschaft (Neueintragung).
Statutendatum:
10.04.2017.
Zweck:
Handel mit sowie Erstellung, Renovation, Verwaltung, Vermietung und Vermittlung von Immobilien aller Art im In- und Ausland;
kann im In- und Ausland Zweigniederlassungen errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen sowie andere Unternehmen erwerben oder erworbene Unternehmen verkaufen, Darlehen aufnehmen und gewähren, Garantien und andere Sicherheiten stellen, Immaterialgüterrechte erwerben, verwalten und verwerten, Wertschriften erwerben, verwalten und verkaufen sowie alle kommerziellen und finanziellen Transaktionen durchführen, die der Verwirklichung des Gesellschaftszwecks förderlich sein könnten.
Aktienkapital:
CHF 200'000.00.
Liberierung Aktienkapital:
CHF 200'000.00.
Aktien:
200 Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.00.
Publikationsorgan:
SHAB. Alle Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre erfolgen rechtsgültig durch eingeschriebenen Brief an die letztgemeldete Adresse der Aktionäre oder schriftliche Mitteilung gegen Empfangsbestätigung.
Vinkulierung:
Die Übertragbarkeit der Namenaktien ist nach Massgabe der Statuten beschränkt. Gemäss Erklärung aller Gründer vom 10.04.2017 untersteht die Gesellschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision.
Eingetragene Personen:
Schröder, Tobias, von Winterthur, in Menziken, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
De Masi, Gaetano, italienischer Staatsangehöriger, in Boniswil, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Kägi, Benno, von Zeiningen, in Wohlen (AG), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Schröder, Suzana, von Winterthur, in Menziken, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Schranz, Christian, von Adelboden, in Baden, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.