Reports for Avallain AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Avallain AG
- Avallain AG is a Company limited by shares (AG) with its legal headquarters in Lustmühle. Avallain AG belongs to the industry «Services regarding management consulting» and is currently active.
- Avallain AG has 5 persons entered in its management.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 07.05.2024.
- The company Avallain AG is registered under the UID CHE-109.474.557.
- View all information about the 5 trademarks registered by the company Avallain AG.
Management (5)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Alexis Allen Walter,
Shkelqim Avdili,
Stefan Nagel,
Ursula Suter-Seuling,
Ignatz Heinz
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
26.02.2002
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Teufen (AR)
Commercial Registry Office
AR
Commercial register number
CH-320.3.051.198-9
UID/VAT
CHE-109.474.557
Sector
Services regarding management consulting
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Beratung und Entwicklung von Konzepten und Produkten im Bereich Information und Wissen. Die Gesellschaft kann Betriebsstätten, Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmungen im In- und Ausland beteiligen. Sie kann Grundstücke erwerben, veräussern, halten und belasten und Kapitalanlagen aller Art halten und verwalten sowie Patente und Lizenzen erwerben und veräussern. Sie kann ausserdem alle kommerziellen, finanziellen und anderen Tätigkeiten ausüben, welche mit dem Zweck der Gesellschaft in Zusammenhang stehen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Rotmonten Wirtschaftsprüfung AG | St. Gallen | 22.12.2020 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
RMI Treuhandexperten AG | Goldach | 03.01.2008 | 08.12.2015 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Trademarks
Trademark | Registration date | Status | Number |
---|---|---|---|
Teachermatic | 20.06.2024 | active | 07164/2024 |
Avallain Author | 08.01.2021 | active | 06903/2020 |
Newest SOGC notifications: Avallain AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006026662, Commercial Registry Office Appenzell A. Rh., (300)
Avallain AG, in Teufen (AR), CHE-109.474.557, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 249 vom 22.12.2022, Publ. 1005636030).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Puntigam, Katja, von Goldach und St. Gallen, in Goldach, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Avdili, Shkelqim, von St. Gallen, in St. Gallen, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien mit Ursula Suter-Seuling oder Ignatz Heinz;
Walter, Alexis Allen, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in St. Gallen, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien mit Ursula Suter-Seuling oder Ignatz Heinz.
Publication number: HR02-1005636030, Commercial Registry Office Appenzell A. Rh., (300)
Avallain AG, in Teufen (AR), CHE-109.474.557, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 208 vom 26.10.2022, Publ. 1005591362).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Heinz, Ignatz, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in St. Gallen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Wald (AR)].
Publication number: HR02-1005591362, Commercial Registry Office Appenzell A. Rh., (300)
Avallain AG, in Teufen (AR), CHE-109.474.557, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 249 vom 22.12.2020, Publ. 1005054950).
Statutenänderung:
21.09.2022 und 19.10.2022.
Aktienkapital neu:
CHF 108'340.00 [bisher: CHF 100'000.00].
Liberierung Aktienkapital neu:
CHF 108'340.00 [bisher: CHF 100'000.00].
Aktien neu:
10'834 Namenaktien zu CHF 10.00 [bisher: 10'000 Namenaktien zu CHF 10.00]. Ordentliche Erhöhung des Aktienkapitals.
Mitteilungen neu:
Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre erfolgen brieflich oder per Email an die im Aktienbuch eingetragenen Personen.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Suter-Seuling, Ursula, von Zollikon und Kölliken, in Teufen (AR), Präsidentin des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: mit Einzelunterschrift];
Heinz, Ignatz, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Wald (AR), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: mit Einzelunterschrift];
Nagel, Stefan, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Wien (AT), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Puntigam, Katja, von Goldach und St. Gallen, in Goldach, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien [bisher: mit Einzelunterschrift].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.