Age of the company
-Turnover in CHF
-Capital in CHF
-Employees
-Active brands
-Reports for ARYZTA Food Europe AG
There is no information available because this company has been deleted.
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierCommercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
11.06.2009
Deletion from the commercial register
28.12.2022
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Schlieren
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-400.3.031.733-7
UID/VAT
CHE-114.910.280
Sector
Business management and administration
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Erwerb, dauernde Verwaltung und Veräusserung von Beteiligungen an in- und ausländischen Unternehmungen aller Art; kann ihren direkten oder indirekten Aktionären oder anderen Konzerngesellschaften Darlehen gewähren und für deren Verbindlichkeiten gegenüber Dritten Sicherheiten aller Art bestellen, einschliesslich Sicherheiten in der Form von Garantien, Pfändern, Globalzessionen und Sicherungsübereignungen eigener Aktiven, auch wenn diese Darlehen oder Sicherheiten unentgeltlich gewährt werden, Mittel am Geld- und Kapitalmarkt aufnehmen und anlegen, Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften errichten sowie Grundstücke erwerben, halten und veräussern.
Auditor
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
PricewaterhouseCoopers AG | Zürich | 22.04.2010 | 28.11.2018 | |
KPMG AG | Zürich | 17.06.2009 | 21.04.2010 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- ARYZTA Food Europe SA
- ARYZTA Food Europe Ltd
- Hiestand Holdings Switzerland AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: ARYZTA Food Europe AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR03-1005639861, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
ARYZTA Food Europe AG, in Schlieren, CHE-114.910.280, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 66 vom 07.04.2021, Publ. 1005141754).
Aktiven und Passiven (Fremdkapital) gehen infolge Fusion auf die ARYZTA Food Solutions Schweiz AG (neu:
HIESTAND Schweiz AG), in Schlieren (CHE-105.903.565), über. Die Gesellschaft wird gelöscht.
Publication number: HR02-1005141754, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
ARYZTA Food Europe AG, in Schlieren, CHE-114.910.280, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 170 vom 04.09.2019, Publ. 1004708469).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Sklikas, Grigorios, griechischer Staatsangehöriger, in Dublin (IE), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1004708469, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
ARYZTA Food Europe AG, in Schlieren, CHE-114.910.280, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 248 vom 21.12.2018, Publ. 1004527162).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Millerberg, Brady, amerikanischer Staatsangehöriger, in Bonstetten, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Murphy, Sean, irischer Staatsangehöriger, in Delgany (IE), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Borgt, Jurgen, niederländischer Staatsangehöriger, in Unterägeri, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.