Address
c/o Mario Rindlisbacher
Büüne 11
3049 Säriswil
Reports for Arboro
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Arboro
- Arboro with its legal headquarters in Säriswil is active. Arboro operates in the sector «Operation of kindergartens and preschools».
- The management of the organization Arboro, which was founded on the 24.06.2020, consists of 4 persons.
- On the 24.01.2023 the commercial register entry of the organization was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The organization's UID is CHE-284.460.182.
Management (4)
newest members of the committee
Lars Ziörjen,
Markus Thomas Keller,
Mario Rindlisbacher,
Mirjam Andrea Wyttenbach Rindlisbacher
newest authorized signatories
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
24.06.2020
Legal form
Association
Legal headquarters of the company
Wohlen bei Bern
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-036.6.081.638-9
UID/VAT
CHE-284.460.182
Sector
Operation of kindergartens and preschools
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Der Verein bezweckt die Förderung von Naturpädagogik in Verbindung mit den Grundsätzen der nicht-direktiven Schulen sowie freier demokratischer Schulen. Der Verein ist gemeinnützig. Der Verein verfolgt keine kommerziellen Zwecke und erstrebt keinen Gewinn.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Arboro
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005659827, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Arboro, in Wohlen bei Bern, CHE-284.460.182, Verein (SHAB Nr. 26 vom 08.02.2021, Publ. 1005094196).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Keller, Markus, von Endingen, in Bremgarten b. Bern (Bremgarten bei Bern), Mitglied des Vorstandes, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Ziörjen, Lars , von Zweisimmen, in Herrenschwanden (Wohlen bei Bern), Mitglied des Vorstandes, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Publication number: HR02-1005094196, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Arboro, in Wohlen bei Bern, CHE-284.460.182, Verein (SHAB Nr. 123 vom 29.06.2020, Publ. 1004922430).
Domizil neu:
c/o Mario Rindlisbacher, Büüne 11, 3049 Säriswil.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Mennig, Franziska, deutsche Staatsangehörige, in Säriswil (Wohlen bei Bern), Vizepräsidentin des Vorstandes, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Rindlisbacher, Mario, von Walkringen, in Säriswil (Wohlen bei Bern), Vizepräsident des Vorstandes, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR01-1004922430, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Arboro, in Wohlen bei Bern, CHE-284.460.182, c/o Franziska Mennig, Staatsstrasse 135, 3049 Säriswil, Verein (Neueintragung).
Statutendatum:
27.02.2020.
Zweck:
Der Verein bezweckt die Förderung von Naturpädagogik in Verbindung mit den Grundsätzen der nicht-direktiven Schulen sowie freier demokratischer Schulen. Der Verein ist gemeinnützig. Der Verein verfolgt keine kommerziellen Zwecke und erstrebt keinen Gewinn.
Mittel:
Mittel: Mitgliederbeiträge, Erträge aus eigenen Veranstaltungen, Erträge aus Leistungsvereinbarungen, Spenden und Zuwendungen aller Art.
Eingetragene Personen:
Wyttenbach Rindlisbacher, Mirjam Andrea, von Kirchdorf (BE), in Säriswil (Wohlen bei Bern), Präsidentin des Vorstandes, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Mennig, Franziska, deutsche Staatsangehörige, in Säriswil (Wohlen bei Bern), Vizepräsidentin des Vorstandes, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.