Reports for Alrawe AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Alrawe AG
- Alrawe AG in Eich is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Manufacturing of other products». Alrawe AG is active.
- The management consists of one person. The company was founded on 02.07.2020.
- The last commercial register change was made on 23.06.2023. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- The company's UID is CHE-131.052.364.
- The company Alrawe AG has currently registered 2 different trademarks or applications for trademarks.
- Bevo-Consulting GmbH, KNU Immobilien AG, OneWayBag AG are registered at the same address.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
02.07.2020
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Eich
Commercial Registry Office
LU
Commercial register number
CH-100.3.810.059-0
UID/VAT
CHE-131.052.364
Sector
Manufacturing of other products
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Entwicklung, Beschaffung, Herstellung und Vertrieb von Freizeit- und Reiseartikeln; Erwerb, Verwaltung, Übertragung, Veräusserung und Lizenzierung von Patenten, Lizenzen, Marken und technischen und industriellen Kenntnissen; Erwerb, Belastung, Veräusserung, Verwaltung, Vermarktung von Grundeigentum und Erstellung von Immobilien; Beteiligungen; Vornahme von Finanzierungen; Eingehung von Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Trademarks
Trademark | Registration date | Status | Number |
---|---|---|---|
14.12.2021 | active | 11147/2021 | |
14.12.2021 | active | 11149/2021 |
Newest SOGC notifications: Alrawe AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005776253, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Alrawe AG, in Eich, CHE-131.052.364, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 248 vom 21.12.2021, Publ. 1005362583).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Weber, Alan Kurt, von Menziken, in Eich, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Weber, Ralf, von Menziken, in Menziken, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Reinach (AG), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: HR02-1005362583, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Alrawe AG, in Eich, CHE-131.052.364, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 129 vom 07.07.2020, Publ. 1004930568).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Weber, Alan Kurt, von Menziken, in Eich, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: HR01-1004930568, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Alrawe AG, in Eich, CHE-131.052.364, Spillgässli 27b, 6205 Eich, Aktiengesellschaft (Neueintragung).
Statutendatum:
29.06.2020.
Zweck:
Entwicklung, Beschaffung, Herstellung und Vertrieb von Freizeit- und Reiseartikeln;
Erwerb, Verwaltung, Übertragung, Veräusserung und Lizenzierung von Patenten, Lizenzen, Marken und technischen und industriellen Kenntnissen;
Erwerb, Belastung, Veräusserung, Verwaltung, Vermarktung von Grundeigentum und Erstellung von Immobilien;
Beteiligungen;
Vornahme von Finanzierungen;
Eingehung von Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte.
Aktienkapital:
CHF 100'000.00.
Liberierung Aktienkapital:
CHF 100'000.00.
Aktien:
1'000 vinkulierte Namenaktien zu CHF 100.00.
Publikationsorgan:
SHAB. Mitteilungen erfolgen per Brief oder E-Mail.
Vinkulierung:
Die Übertragbarkeit der Namenaktien ist nach Massgabe der Statuten beschränkt. Mit Erklärung vom 29.06.2020 wurde auf die eingeschränkte Revision verzichtet.
Eingetragene Personen:
Weber, Alan Kurt, von Menziken, in Eich, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Weber, Ralf, von Menziken, in Reinach (AG), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.