Branches (1)
Reports for Aktiengesellschaft Cilander in Liquidation
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Aktiengesellschaft Cilander in Liquidation
- Aktiengesellschaft Cilander in Liquidation has its legal headquarters in Herisau, is in liquidation and operates in the sector «Textile refinement».
- The management of the company Aktiengesellschaft Cilander in Liquidation consists of 11 persons.
- The commercial register entry of the company was last modified on 21.08.2024. Under «Notifications» it is possible to view all previous changes.
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the company Aktiengesellschaft Cilander in Liquidation is the following: CHE-105.971.319.
- Alumo AG, Wohlfahrtsstiftung der Aktiengesellschaft Cilander are registered at the same address.
Management (11)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Martin Frischknecht,
Rolf Georg Schmid,
Sonja Amport,
Petra Jordi-Rüegg,
Marc Fritz Preysch
Liquidator
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
05.01.1888
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Herisau
Commercial Registry Office
AR
Commercial register number
CH-300.3.011.832-9
UID/VAT
CHE-105.971.319
Sector
Textile refinement
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Veredlung von Textilien jeglicher Art. Sie kann sich auch mit der Fabrikation und dem Handel von Textilien sowie mit der Verwertung von Erfindungen und Entwicklungen befassen und Geschäfte tätigen, die damit in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die indirekt oder direkt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Dafür kann die Gesellschaft auch Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten, sowie Finanzierungen vornehmen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Dr. Rietmann & Partner AG, Wirtschaftsprüfer und Steuerberater | St. Gallen | 24.11.2005 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
KPMG AG | St. Gallen | <2004 | 23.11.2005 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Aktiengesellschaft Cilander
- AG Cilander
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Aktiengesellschaft Cilander in Liquidation
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006111050, Commercial Registry Office Appenzell A. Rh., (300)
Aktiengesellschaft Cilander in Liquidation, in Herisau, CHE-105.971.319, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 84 vom 01.05.2024, Publ. 1006022575).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Polet, Maurizio, von Waldstatt, in Lutzenberg, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1006022575, Commercial Registry Office Appenzell A. Rh., (300)
Aktiengesellschaft Cilander in Liquidation, in Herisau, CHE-105.971.319, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 48 vom 08.03.2024, Publ. 1005981220).
Statutenänderung:
25.04.2024. Die publikationspflichtigen Tatsachen haben keine Änderung erfahren.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Herrmannsdörfer, Steffen, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Efringen-Kirchen (DE), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates und Liquidator, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Publication number: HR02-1005981220, Commercial Registry Office Appenzell A. Rh., (300)
Aktiengesellschaft Cilander, in Herisau, CHE-105.971.319, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 15 vom 23.01.2024, Publ. 1005941556).
Firma neu:
Aktiengesellschaft Cilander in Liquidation.
Vinkulierung neu:
Die Beschränkung der Übertragbarkeit der Namenaktien ist im Sinne von Art. 685a Abs. 3 OR aufgehoben. Die Gesellschaft ist mit Beschluss der Generalversammlung vom 22.02.2024 aufgelöst.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schmid, Rolf G., von Lenzburg, in Lenzburg, Präsident des Verwaltungsratesund Liquidator, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates];
Amport, Sonja, von Bretzwil, in Aeugst am Albis, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates und Liquidatorin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates];
Frischknecht, Martin, von Herisau, in Gais, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates und Liquidator, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates];
Herrmannsdörfer, Steffen, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Efringen-Kirchen (DE), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates und Liquidator, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.