Reports for Aeschlimann Sanitär AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Aeschlimann Sanitär AG
- Aeschlimann Sanitär AG has its legal headquarters in Burgdorf and is active. It operates in the sector «Other construction».
- The management of the company Aeschlimann Sanitär AG, which was founded on the 17.12.2001, consists of 2 persons.
- The commercial register entry of the company was last modified on 04.01.2023. Under «Notifications» it is possible to view all previous changes.
- Aeschlimann Sanitär AG is registered in the Canton of BE under the UID CHE-109.381.134.
- On the same address there are 2 other active companies registered. These include: mafa Holding GmbH, Walter Uebersax Burgdorf GmbH.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
17.12.2001
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Burgdorf
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-053.3.015.554-7
UID/VAT
CHE-109.381.134
Sector
Other construction
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
lanung, Projektierung, Ausführung und Reparatur von Installationen der Haustechnik (Sanitär, Heizung, Lüftung, Klima) sowie die Ausarbeitung von Expertisen. Die Gesellschaft kann Grundstücke erwerben und verkaufen
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
auditpartner ag | Bern | 27.12.2018 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Kenora AG | Kirchberg (BE) | 23.01.2012 | 26.12.2018 | |
Gewerbeberatung, Management Support, Fred Fuhrer, lic.rer.pol. | Uster | <2004 | 22.01.2012 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Aeschlimann Sanitärtechnik AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Aeschlimann Sanitär AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005643544, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Aeschlimann Sanitär AG, in Burgdorf, CHE-109.381.134, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 250 vom 27.12.2018, Publ. 1004530552).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Studer, Kurt, von Langnau im Emmental, in Ersigen, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Binz, Thomas, von Eriswil, in Kräiligen (Bätterkinden), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Fankhauser, Matthias, von Trub, in Ersigen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1004530552, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Aeschlimann Sanitär AG, in Burgdorf, CHE-109.381.134, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 132 vom 11.07.2014, Publ. 1607675).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Kenora AG (CHE-114.619.152), in Kirchberg BE, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
auditpartner ag (CHE-101.063.699), in Bern, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: 1607675, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Aeschlimann Sanitär AG, in Burgdorf, CHE-109.381.134, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 15 vom 23.01.2012, Publ. 6515592).
Domizil neu:
Einschlagweg 59c, 3400 Burgdorf.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Binz, Thomas, von Eriswil, in Kräiligen (Bätterkinden), Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Kräiligen (Gemeinde Bätterkinden)];
Kenora AG (CHE-114.619.152), in Kirchberg BE, Revisionsstelle [bisher: Kenora AG (CH-036.3.043.480-3)].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.