Dietmar Michael Zacher
domiciled in Uznach, from Uznach Active mandates: Raiffeisenbank Benken Genossenschaft, AIA Gruppe AG and more Connected persons: Nathalie Glaus Cherella, Dominik Zellweger, Fabian Fässler and more You can stay up to date through "Dietmar Michael Zacher", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Dietmar Michael Zacher"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Dietmar Michael Zacher", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Dietmar Michael Zacher"
|
Places where people with the name Dietmar Michael Zacher live
Sectors in which people with the name Dietmar Michael Zacher work
Operation of banks and credit institutions
Operation of other financial institutions
Services regarding management consulting
Operation of banks and credit institutions
Operation of other financial institutions
Services regarding management consulting
Private persons with the name Dietmar Michael Zacher
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Dietmar Michael Zacher
Publication number: HR02-1005155232, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Raiffeisenbank Benken Genossenschaft, in Benken (SG), CHE-107.293.625, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 68 vom 09.04.2021, Publ. 1005145355).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Mettler-Kissling, Daniela, von Reichenburg, in Benken SG, Präsidentin der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Lins, Herbert, von Rapperswil-Jona, in Altendorf, Mitglied der Verwaltung, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
PricewaterhouseCoopers AG (CHE-364.598.872), in St. Gallen, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Zacher, Dietmar, von Uznach, in Uznach, Präsident der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied der Verwaltung, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung];
Fretz, Bruno, von Bottenwil, in Gommiswald, Mitglied der Verwaltung, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Zahner, Martin, von Kaltbrunn, in Benken SG, Mitglied der Verwaltung, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Ernst & Young AG (CHE-105.932.265), in Basel, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: HR02-1005075148, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Raiffeisenbank Benken Genossenschaft, in Benken (SG), CHE-107.293.625, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 152 vom 07.08.2020, Publ. 1004953818).
Statutenänderung:
17.04.2020.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Zacher, Dietmar, von Uznach, in Uznach, Mitglied der Verwaltung, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
PricewaterhouseCoopers AG (CHE-364.598.872), in St. Gallen, Revisionsstelle [bisher: PricewaterhouseCoopers AG (CH-320.9.045.078-2)].
Publication number: HR02-1005068572, Commercial Registry Office Schwyz, (130)
Nova Vorsorge AG, in Schwyz, CHE-113.513.338, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 14 vom 22.01.2019, Publ. 1004547499).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Reinhard Stahel, Nicole A., von Winterthur, in Schwyz, Präsidentin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schmidt, Michael Niklaus, von Zürich, in Hinwil, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Zacher, Dietmar, von Uznach, in Uznach, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: ohne eingetragene Funktion, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien].