Klaus Wüthrich
domiciled in Marthalen, from Eggiwil Active mandates: Emil Keller AG, KWS Reinigungsmaschinen AG and more Connected persons: Albert Viktor Herzog, Thomas Werner Suter, Michael M. Hartung and more You can stay up to date through "Klaus Wüthrich", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Klaus Wüthrich"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Klaus Wüthrich", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Klaus Wüthrich"
|
Places where people with the name Klaus Wüthrich live
Sectors in which people with the name Klaus Wüthrich work
Building installations
Trading with machines
Building installations
Trading with machines
Private persons with the name Klaus Wüthrich
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Klaus Wüthrich
Publication number: HR02-1005995376, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Emil Keller AG, in Winterthur, CHE-106.947.447, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 170 vom 04.09.2014, S.0, Publ. 1697453).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Oberhänsli, André, von Wäldi, in Marthalen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Wüthrich, Klaus, von Eggiwil, in Marthalen, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Herzog, Albert, von Homburg, in Frauenfeld, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Suter, Thomas, von Winterthur, in Winterthur, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 3254979, Commercial Registry Office Ticino, (501)
CERIN CARRELLI SA, in Giubiasco, CHE-108.160.033, società anonima (FUSC no. 51 del 16.03.2015, Pubbl. 2044747).
Nuova ragione sociale:
CERIN CARRELLI SA in liquidazione.
Nuovo recapito:
Indirizzo della società in liquidazione: c/o REBEFID Sagl, succursale di Paradiso, Riva Paradiso 2a, 6902 Paradiso. La società è sciolta con decisione dell'assemblea generale del 16.12.2016.
Nuove persone iscritte o modifiche:
Wüthrich, Klaus, da Eggiwil, in Marthalen, presidente e liquidatore, con firma individuale [finora: presidente con firma individuale];
Herzog, Albert Viktor, da Homburg, in Frauenfeld, membro, senza diritto di firma [finora: membro con firma collettiva a due];
Ugolini, Aldo, da Winterthur, in Marthalen, senza diritto di firma [finora: senza funzione registrata con procura collettiva a due];
Suter, Thomas Werner, da Winterthur, in Winterthur, membro, senza diritto di firma [finora: membro con firma collettiva a due];
Kuhn, Roger, da Illnau-Effretikon, in Illnau-Effretikon, gerente sostituto, senza diritto di firma [finora: da Illnau-Effretikon, gerente sostituto con procura collettiva a due].
Publication number: 3083451, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
KWS Stapler AG, in Marthalen, CHE-341.099.138, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 248 vom 22.12.2015, Publ. 2556339).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Wüthrich, Klaus, von Eggiwil, in Marthalen, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates mit Einzelunterschrift];
Herzog, Albert, von Homburg, in Frauenfeld, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Suter, Thomas Werner, von Winterthur, in Winterthur, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.