François Vuille
domiciled in Hünenberg, from La Sagne Active mandates: Viscom Engineering AG Connected persons: Annina Andres, Stephan Zosso, Pascal Bochud and more You can stay up to date through "François Vuille", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "François Vuille"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "François Vuille", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "François Vuille"
|
Places where people with the name François Vuille live
Sectors in which people with the name François Vuille work
Other construction
Other construction
Private persons with the name François Vuille
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: François Vuille
Publication number: 4400543, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Viscom Engineering AG, in Affoltern am Albis, CHE-107.333.130, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 172 vom 07.09.2015, Publ. 2359053).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Vuille, François, von La Sagne, in Hünenberg, mit Einzelprokura.
Publication number: 2295997, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
Alternative Bank Schweiz AG, in Olten, CHE-106.062.738, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 31 vom 16.02.2015, Publ. 1990589).
Statutenänderung:
25.04.2015. Die anlässlich der Generalversammlung vom 24.05.2013 eingeführte genehmigte Kapitalerhöhung fällt dahin, da die Generalversammlung mit Beschluss vom 25.04.2015 erneut eine genehmigte Kapitalerhöhung gemäss näherer Umschreibung in den Statuten eingeführt hat.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Vuille, François, von Lausanne, in Chexbres, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Cabarrubia, Francisco, von Elsau, in Winterthur, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Ledermann, Irene, von Madiswil, in Zofingen, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Lüscher, Monika, von Küttigen, in Concise, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Schnüriger, Bernadette, von Schwyz, in Oberwil BL, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Jiménez Garcia, Juan Ignacio, spanischer Staatsangehöriger, in Genf, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Nusslé, Frédéric, von Lutry, in Lausanne, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Publication number: 1550051, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Caisse de prévoyance professionnelle de Sonceboz S.A., à Sonceboz-Sombeval, CHE-109.507.754, fondation (No. FOSC 57 du 21.03.2012, Publ. 6603164).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Vuille, Françoise, de Tramelan, à Corgémont, présidente, avec signature collective à deux;
Pfister, Jean-François, de Zurich, à Sonceboz-Sombeval, membre, sans droit de signature;
Bratschi, Philippe, de Safnern, à Malleray, membre, sans droit de signature.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Cabocel, Alexandra Renée Raymonde, ressortissante française, à Damprichard (FR), présidente, avec signature collective à deux;
Gagnebin, Marc-André, de Tramelan, à Tavannes, membre, avec signature collective à deux;
Martin, Nathalie Jeanne Yvette, ressortissante française, à Pierrefontaine les Varans (FR), membre, sans droit de signature;
Arista Fiduciaire SA (CHE-114.812.016), à Biel/Bienne, organe de révision [précédemment: Arista Fiduciaire SA (CH-036.3.044.479-1)].