Robert Karl Sulzer
domiciled in Trin, from Winterthur Active mandates: Akrus Atlas AG, Uzbek-Swiss Chamber of Commerce and Industry and more Connected persons: Heinz Léon Wyssling, Gulnara Salimova, Francesca Lardi and more You can stay up to date through "Robert Karl Sulzer", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Robert Karl Sulzer"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Robert Karl Sulzer", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Robert Karl Sulzer"
|
Places where people with the name Robert Karl Sulzer live
Sectors in which people with the name Robert Karl Sulzer work
Operation of other financial institutions
Associations and federations
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Services regarding management consulting
Photography, Operation of photo labs
Fiduciary services
Operation of other financial institutions
Associations and federations
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Services regarding management consulting
Photography, Operation of photo labs
Fiduciary services
Private persons with the name Robert Karl Sulzer
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Robert Karl Sulzer
Publication number: HR02-1005957564, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden
R. Sulzer Beteiligungen Chur GmbH, in Chur, CHE-112.294.205, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 188 vom 29.09.2008, S.11, Publ. 4669348).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Sulzer, Lukretia, von Winterthur, in Chur, Gesellschafterin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 1'000.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Sulzer, Robert, von Winterthur, in Trin, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 19'000.00 und mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 19'000.00].
Publication number: HR02-1005539390, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden
Treuhandbüro R. Sulzer, in Chur, CHE-107.023.066, Einzelunternehmen (SHAB Nr. 16 vom 25.01.2021, Publ. 1005082359).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Sulzer, Robert Karl, von Winterthur, in Trin, Inhaber, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Sulzer, Robert K.]
Publication number: HR02-1005489320, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden
Akrus Atlas AG, bisher in Zug, CHE-302.888.350, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 65 vom 01.04.2022, Publ. 1005440719).
Statutenänderung:
30.05.2022.
Sitz neu:
Chur.
Domizil neu:
Gäuggelistrasse 25, 7000 Chur.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Sulzer, Robert, von Winterthur, in Trin, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift.