Roger Philipp Hans Spirig
domiciled in Widnau, from Widnau and Diepoldsau Active mandates: IES Systems AG, BüroTech Spirig AG Connected persons: Philipp Markus Spirig-Wüst, Philipp Markus Spirig-Wüst You can stay up to date through "Roger Philipp Hans Spirig", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Roger Philipp Hans Spirig"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Roger Philipp Hans Spirig", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Roger Philipp Hans Spirig"
|
Places where people with the name Roger Philipp Hans Spirig live
Sectors in which people with the name Roger Philipp Hans Spirig work
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Trading in IT and communications products
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Trading in IT and communications products
Private persons with the name Roger Philipp Hans Spirig
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Roger Philipp Hans Spirig
Publication number: HR02-1005064229, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Locher Trade RG AG, in Berneck, CHE-101.632.226, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 116 vom 18.06.2020, Publ. 1004913920).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Spirig, Philipp, von Diepoldsau, in Widnau, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Cuomo, Luigi, italienischer Staatsangehöriger, in Diepoldsau, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: HR02-1004997802, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
San-Vini S.a g.l., in Berneck, CHE-101.503.468, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 97 vom 22.05.2015, S.0, Publ. 2165735).
Firma neu:
San-Vini S.a g.l. in Liquidation.
Uebersetzungen der Firma neu:
(San-Vini GmbH in Liquidation). Die Gesellschaft ist mit Beschluss der Gesellschafterversammlung vom 06.10.2020 aufgelöst.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Spirig, Philipp, von Diepoldsau, in Widnau, Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, Liquidator, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 20'000.00 [bisher: von Diepoldsau und Widnau, Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: 5647868, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
San-Vini S.a g.l., in Berneck, CH-320.4.040.762-5, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 30 vom 13.02.2009, S. 14, Publ. 4878568).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Locher Trade RG AG, in Berneck, Gesellschafterin, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 20'000.00;
Spirig, Philipp, von Diepoldsau, in Widnau, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Spirig, Roger, von Diepoldsau und Widnau, in Widnau, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 20'000.00.