Claes Smith-Solbakken
domiciled in Malmö, from Norway Active mandates: ARBAN GROUP AG Connected persons: Fredy Bayard You can stay up to date through "Claes Smith-Solbakken", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Claes Smith-Solbakken"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Claes Smith-Solbakken", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Claes Smith-Solbakken"
|
Places where people with the name Claes Smith-Solbakken live
Sectors in which people with the name Claes Smith-Solbakken work
Services regarding management consulting
Services regarding management consulting
Private persons with the name Claes Smith-Solbakken
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Claes Smith-Solbakken
Publication number: 2394179, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
RAVN AG, in Liestal, CHE-115.300.055, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 199 vom 15.10.2014, Publ. 1768947).
Firma neu:
RAVN AG in Liquidation. Die Gesellschaft ist mit Beschluss der Generalversammlung vom 18.09.2015 aufgelöst.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Smith-Solbakken, Claes, schwedischer Staatsangehöriger, in London (UK), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bayard Treuhand GmbH (CHE-104.987.499), in Liestal, Liquidatorin.
Publication number: 1405569, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
ARBAN GROUP AG, in Liestal, CHE-388.375.104, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 28 vom 11.02.2014, Publ. 1338383).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Smith-Solbakken, Claes, norwegischer Staatsangehöriger, in Malmö (SE), Direktor, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: 6914414, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
RAVN AG, bisher in Basel, CH-270.3.014.246-0, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 112 vom 12.06.2012, Publ. 6714258).
Gründungsstatuten:
16.12.2009.
Statutenänderung:
13.09.2012.
Sitz neu:
Oberägeri.
Domizil neu:
c/o Frank Dietmar Brinker, Holderbachweg 14, 6315 Oberägeri.
Zweck neu:
Erbringung sämtlicher Dienstleistungen in den Bereichen Anlageberatung, Fonds-, Vermögens- und Finanzverwaltung;
vollständige Zweckumschreibung gemäss Statuten.
Mitteilungen neu:
Die Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre erfolgen durch Publikation im SHAB oder, sofern die Namen und Adressen sämtlicher Aktionäre bekannt sind, durch Brief.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Smith-Solbakken, Claes, schwedischer Staatsangehöriger, in London (UK), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Smith-Solbakken, Claes];
Brinker, Frank Dietmar, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Oberägeri, Zeichnungsberechtigter, mit Einzelunterschrift.