Herbert Schmidt
domiciled in Seuzach, from Winterthur Active mandates: Schmidt Spital- und Heimlogistik Connected persons: No connected person You can stay up to date through "Herbert Schmidt", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Herbert Schmidt"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Herbert Schmidt", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Herbert Schmidt"
|
|
Herbert Schmidt
domiciled in Laufenburg, from Germany Active mandates: Herbert Schmidt AG Connected persons: Sarah-Marisa Kaiser You can stay up to date through "Herbert Schmidt", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Herbert Schmidt"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Herbert Schmidt", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Herbert Schmidt"
|
|
Herbert Schmidt
domiciled in München, from Germany Active mandates: G+S Werkzeugmaschinen GmbH Connected persons: Urs W. Berner You can stay up to date through "Herbert Schmidt", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Herbert Schmidt"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Herbert Schmidt", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Herbert Schmidt"
|
|
Herbert Schmidt
domiciled in Meggen, from Goms Active mandates: Swiss Waters International GmbH Meggen in Liquidation Connected persons: Sara Schmidt You can stay up to date through "Herbert Schmidt", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Herbert Schmidt"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Herbert Schmidt", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Herbert Schmidt"
|
Places where people with the name Herbert Schmidt live
Sectors in which people with the name Herbert Schmidt work
Services regarding management consulting
Trading in consumer goods
Trading with machines
Trading with various goods
Services regarding management consulting
Trading in consumer goods
Trading with machines
Trading with various goods
Private persons with the name Herbert Schmidt
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Herbert Schmidt
Publication number: HR02-1006021162, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Swiss Waters International GmbH Meggen, in Meggen, CHE-115.000.943, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 117 vom 20.06.2022, Publ. 1005499309).
Firma neu:
Swiss Waters International GmbH Meggen in Liquidation.
Uebersetzungen der Firma neu:
(Swiss Waters International SARL Meggen en liquidation) (Swiss Waters International SAGL Meggen in liquidazione) (Swiss Waters International Ltd liab. Co Meggen in liquidation). Die Gesellschaft hat sich mit Beschluss der ausserordentlichen Gesellschafterversammlung vom 24.04.2024 aufgelöst.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schmidt, Herbert, von Goms, in Meggen, Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, Liquidator, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 200 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00 [bisher: Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: HR02-1005432197, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
nuWay AG in Liquidation, in Opfikon, CHE-345.792.391, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 54 vom 17.03.2022, Publ. 1005428917).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Schmidt, Herbert, von Winterthur, in Seuzach, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005366561, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
nuWay AG, in Opfikon, CHE-345.792.391, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 14 vom 21.01.2021, Publ. 1005079169).
Statutenänderung:
16.12.2021.
Aktienkapital neu:
CHF 168'322.00 [bisher: CHF 140'152.00].
Liberierung Aktienkapital neu:
CHF 168'322.00 [bisher: CHF 140'152.00].
Aktien neu:
168'322 Namenaktien zu CHF 1.00 [bisher: 140'152 Namenaktien zu CHF 1.00]. Bei der ordentlichen Kapitalerhöhung vom 16.12.2021 werden Forderungen in der Höhe von CHF 665'533.09 verrechnet, wofür 28'170 Namenaktien zu CHF 1.00 ausgegeben werden.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Obrist, Lukas Karl, von Riniken, in St. Gallen, Vorsitzender der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Hug, Raphael, von Thunstetten, in Zürich, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Vorsitzender der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Schmidt, Herbert, von Winterthur, in Seuzach, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: ohne eingetragene Funktion, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien];
Stöckli, Ronald, von Rottenschwil, in Zürich, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].