Peter Paul Schmid
domiciled in Brig, from Brig-Glis and Ausserberg Active mandates: Moritz Kämpfen-Stiftung in Liquidation, Ertag, Entsorgung, Recycling, Transporte AG and more Connected persons: Jürg Albert Kämpfen, Mathias Bellwald, Gerhard Heinrich Schmidt and more You can stay up to date through "Peter Paul Schmid", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Peter Paul Schmid"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Peter Paul Schmid", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Peter Paul Schmid"
|
|
Peter Paul Schmid
domiciled in Brig, from Ausserberg Active mandates: Stiftung Jugendwohngruppe Anderledy Connected persons: Stanislaus Lauber, Claudia Elsa Alpiger, Mathias Witschard and more You can stay up to date through "Peter Paul Schmid", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Peter Paul Schmid"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Peter Paul Schmid", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Peter Paul Schmid"
|
|
Peter Paul Schmid
domiciled in Cartigny, from Genève Active mandates: Arbolfin AG, ALPHA VIRDIS AG in Liquidation and more Connected persons: Ernst Peter Röthlisberger, Marco Däscher, Sergio Luca Cocchi and more You can stay up to date through "Peter Paul Schmid", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Peter Paul Schmid"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Peter Paul Schmid", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Peter Paul Schmid"
|
Places where people with the name Peter Paul Schmid live
Sectors in which people with the name Peter Paul Schmid work
Religious, political or secular associations
Waste collection, treatment and disposal
Road, railway and tunnel construction
Operation of libraries and museums
Underground lines and sewage treatment plants
Operation of other homes (excluding holiday homes)
Trading with various goods
Agriculture (various)
Fund management
Religious, political or secular associations
Waste collection, treatment and disposal
Road, railway and tunnel construction
Operation of libraries and museums
Underground lines and sewage treatment plants
Operation of other homes (excluding holiday homes)
Trading with various goods
Agriculture (various)
Fund management
Private persons with the name Peter Paul Schmid
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Peter Paul Schmid
Publication number: 3721005, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
Association valaisanne de l'industrie des graviers et du béton (AVGB), à Sion, CHE-101.734.766, association (No. FOSC 57 du 22.03.2017, Publ. 3419343).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Schmid, Peter, de Ausserberg, à Brig-Glis, vice-président, avec signature collective à deux.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Tissières, Vincent, de Saint-Léonard, à Sierre, vice-président du comité, avec signature collective à deux [précédemment: membre, avec signature collective à deux avec le président ou le vice-président];
Meile, Carole , de Raron, à Raron, membre du comité, avec signature collective à deux avec le président ou le vice-président.
Publication number: 1764391, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
Association Valaisanne de l'industrie de la pierre, à Sion, CHE-101.734.766, association (No. FOSC 266 du 14.11.1979, p. 3586).
Modification des statuts:
23.05.1995, 26.03.1998, 10.11.2006, 27.05.2014.
Nouveau nom:
Association valaisanne de l'industrie des graviers et du béton (AVGB).
Nouvelle adresse:
c/o Association Valaisanne des Entrepreneurs du Bâtiment et du Génie civil (AVE), Rue de l'Avenir 11, Case postale 62, 1951 Sion.
Nouveau but:
Regrouper les entreprises valaisannes de l'industrie de la pierre, du gravier et du béton (cf. statuts pour but complet).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Pattaroni, Georges, de Pierre, de Vérossaz, à Monthey, président, avec signature collective à deux;
Nichini, Albert, de Icogne, à Sion, vice-président, avec signature collective à deux;
Pierroz, Amy, de Martigny-Combe, à Sion, secrétaire, avec signature collective à deux avec le président ou le vice-président.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Ricardo, Luis, de Monthey, à Monthey, président, avec signature collective à deux;
Schmid, Peter, de Ausserberg, à Brigue (Brig-Glis), vice-président, avec signature collective à deux;
Bornet, Gérard, de Nendaz, à Sion, secrétaire (hors-conseil), avec signature collective à deux avec le président ou le vice-président;
Furrer, Jean Marc, de Eisten, à Montana, membre, sans droit de signature;
Aeby, Didier, de Giffers, à Fribourg, membre, sans droit de signature;
Tissières, Marc André, de Saint-Léonard, à Saint-Léonard, membre, sans droit de signature. [Modification des statuts sur des points non soumis à publication].
Publication number: 1432773, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Deutsche Bank (Suisse) SA, in Zürich, CHE-389.881.516, Zweigniederlassung (SHAB Nr. 212 vom 01.11.2013, Publ. 1157561).
mit Hauptsitz in:
Genf.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Schmid, Peter Paul, von Oberegg, in Wallisellen, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Legel, Marion, deutsche Staatsangehörige, in Brüttisellen, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Johannes, Oliver, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Zürich, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Papanikolaou Batsilas, Christos, griechischer Staatsangehöriger, in Zug, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Balestra, Alessandro, italienischer Staatsangehöriger, in Zürich, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Bauer, Rolf, von Degersheim, in Herrliberg, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
von Dobbeler, Jan, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Küsnacht ZH, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.