Rudolf Schibli
domiciled in Sevelen, from Fislisbach Active mandates: Baudienstleistungen Schibli Connected persons: No connected person You can stay up to date through "Rudolf Schibli", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Rudolf Schibli"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Rudolf Schibli", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Rudolf Schibli"
|
|
Rudolf Schibli
domiciled in Seedorf UR, from Eiken Active mandates: schweizermessebau ag, Soprema AG Connected persons: Josef Huwyler, Angela Häfeli, Christian Truog and more You can stay up to date through "Rudolf Schibli", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Rudolf Schibli"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Rudolf Schibli", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Rudolf Schibli"
|
|
Rudolf Schibli
domiciled in Bauen, from Eiken Active mandates: Prenotec GmbH Connected persons: Dominik Haefeli, Edgar Robalo Antunes, Daniele Di Ninno and more You can stay up to date through "Rudolf Schibli", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Rudolf Schibli"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Rudolf Schibli", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Rudolf Schibli"
|
Places where people with the name Rudolf Schibli live
Sectors in which people with the name Rudolf Schibli work
Architectural and engineering activities
Trade fair, exhibition and convention organising
Various industrial production
Architectural and engineering activities
Trade fair, exhibition and convention organising
Various industrial production
Private persons with the name Rudolf Schibli
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Rudolf Schibli
Publication number: HR02-1005549691, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
schweizermessebau ag, in Muri (AG), CHE-109.871.119, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 214 vom 03.11.2021, Publ. 1005326130).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Schweizer, Beat, von Rüti bei Riggisberg, in Hagendorn , Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schibli, Rudolf, von Eiken, in Seedorf (UR), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Weggis, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Häfeli, Angela, von Seengen, in Seedorf (UR), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Huwyler, Josef, von Mühlau, in Cham, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Truog, Christian, von Grüsch, in Zürich, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Walter, Tom, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Meisterschwanden, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005257642, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
Berichtigung des im SHAB vom 20.07.2021, Meldungs Nr. 1'005'253'381, publizierten Tagesregistereintrages Nr. 14'160 vom 15.07.2021 Emano Trading GmbH, in Baar, CHE-201.708.539, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 138 vom 20.07.2021, Publ. 1005253381).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Schibli, Rudolf, von Eiken, in Weggis, Zeichnungsberechtigter, mit Einzelunterschrift, .
Publication number: HR02-1005253353, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
Emano AG, in Baar, CHE-112.145.723, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 116 vom 18.06.2021, Publ. 1005221738).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Schibli, Rudolf, von Eiken, in Weggis, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Häfeli, Angela, von Seengen, in Seedorf (UR), Präsidentin des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift, Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift.