Beat Scheiwiller
domiciled in Winterthur, from Winterthur Active mandates: Tiffany-Glas Scheiwiller Connected persons: Urs Scheiwiller You can stay up to date through "Beat Scheiwiller", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Beat Scheiwiller"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Beat Scheiwiller", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Beat Scheiwiller"
|
|
Beat Scheiwiller
domiciled in Zürich, from Zürich and Waldkirch Active mandates: scheiwiller architekten ag Connected persons: Thomas Scheiwiller You can stay up to date through "Beat Scheiwiller", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Beat Scheiwiller"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Beat Scheiwiller", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Beat Scheiwiller"
|
Places where people with the name Beat Scheiwiller live
Sectors in which people with the name Beat Scheiwiller work
Manufacturing and processing of glass and ceramic
Architectural and engineering activities
Manufacturing and processing of glass and ceramic
Architectural and engineering activities
Private persons with the name Beat Scheiwiller
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Beat Scheiwiller
Publication number: HR02-1004567719, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Dorfgarage von Mentlen AG, in Waldkirch, CHE-107.931.992, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 219 vom 12.11.2018, S.0, Publ. 1004495570).
Statutenänderung:
07.02.2019.
Firma neu:
Dorfgarage Waldkirch AG.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Scheiwiller, Beat Justin, von Waldkirch, in Niederbüren, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Hollenstein, Remo, von Mosnang, in Berg TG, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1004495570, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Dorfgarage von Mentlen AG, in Waldkirch, CHE-107.931.992, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 217 vom 08.11.2017, Publ. 3856879).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
von Mentlen, Herbert, von Erstfeld, in Waldkirch, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
von Mentlen, Jeannette, von Erstfeld, in Andwil SG, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Scheiwiller, Beat Justin, von Waldkirch, in Niederbüren, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: 689410, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Genossenschaft Hofgarten, in Zürich, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 186 vom 26.09.2001, S. 7486).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Künzli, Heinz, von Murgenthal, in Zürich, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Scheiwiller, Beat, von Zürich und Waldkirch, in Zürich, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Furrer, Marie-Louise, von Zürich, in Zürich, Mitglied und Quästorin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Frank, Ulrich, von Langnau im Emmental, in Zürich, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Vizepräsident];
Merazzi, Reto, von Arvigo, in Zürich, Mitglied und Quästor, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.